This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/22/2022 at 15:36:10 (UTC).

SATLOW, AVI -VS- DOORDASH INC et al

Case Summary

On 03/07/2022 SATLOW, AVI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DOORDASH INC. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is VAN VORST, KRISTINE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0821

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Judge Details

Judge

VAN VORST, KRISTINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SATLOW, AVI

Riverview, FL 33578

Defendants

DOORDASH INC

R/A Registered Agent Solutions, Inc, 155 Office Plaza Dr Ste A

Tallahassee, FL 32301

TACO BELL OF AMERICA LLC

R/A Ct Corporation System, 1200 South Pine Island Rd

Plantation, FL 33324

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

03/07/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS / CLERK'S DETERMINATION (INDIGENT)

03/07/2022: APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS / CLERK'S DETERMINATION (INDIGENT)

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE; DOORDASH INC (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

03/07/2022: SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE; DOORDASH INC (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE; TACO BELL OF AMERICA LLC (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

03/07/2022: SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE; TACO BELL OF AMERICA LLC (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

03/10/2022: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM ( ; Amount: $55.00; Amount Due: $0.00

03/07/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM ( ; Amount: $55.00; Amount Due: $0.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2022
  • HearingSMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE; Judge: VAN VORST, KRISTINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketALERT ISSUED; INDIGENT issued on: 03/08/2022 ; For: SATLOW, AVI ; Bond Amt: ; Bond Type:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $75.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $75.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE; TACO BELL OF AMERICA LLC (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE; DOORDASH INC (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 05/27/2022 Time: 9:00 am ; Judge: VAN VORST - DIV V, KRISTINE Location: COURTROOM 2-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS / CLERK'S DETERMINATION (INDIGENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM (; Amount: $55.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Doordash, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Taco Bell of America LLc is a litigant