This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/01/2023 at 04:27:40 (UTC).

SAR PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC -vs- BLANKENSHIP, CHRISTOPHER

Case Summary

On 11/10/2022 SAR PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against BLANKENSHIP, CHRISTOPHER. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4191

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAR PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC

Defendants

BLANKENSHIP, CHRISTOPHER

Gainesville, FL 32607

BLANKENSHIP, CHRISTOPHER BRANDON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIEGEL ESQ, MATTHEW E

2753 Sr 580, Ste 209

Clearwater, FL 33761

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION - NO MONEY CLAIM Receipt: 493201 Date: 11/10/2022; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

11/09/2022: COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION - NO MONEY CLAIM Receipt: 493201 Date: 11/10/2022; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

11/09/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO CHRISTOPHER BLANKENSHIP A/K/A CHRISTOPHER BRANDON BLANKENSHIP (DEFENDANT); WITH FEE Receipt: 493201 Date: 11/10/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

11/09/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO CHRISTOPHER BLANKENSHIP A/K/A CHRISTOPHER BRANDON BLANKENSHIP (DEFENDANT); WITH FEE Receipt: 493201 Date: 11/10/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

SHERIFF'S RETURN SERVED 11/18/2022; CHRISTOPHER BLANKENSHIP (DEFENDANT);

11/22/2022: SHERIFF'S RETURN SERVED 11/18/2022; CHRISTOPHER BLANKENSHIP (DEFENDANT);

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

11/23/2022: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY (ISSUED 12/7/2022-KBH); AS TO CHRISTOPHER BLANKENSHIP AKA CHRISTOPHER BRANDON BLAKENSHIP

12/05/2022: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY (ISSUED 12/7/2022-KBH); AS TO CHRISTOPHER BLANKENSHIP AKA CHRISTOPHER BRANDON BLAKENSHIP

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

12/05/2022: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5-DAY EVICTION SUMMONS - SERVED 11/18/2022 CHRISTOPHER BLANKENSHIP AKA CHRISTOPHER BRANDON BLANKENSHIP (DEFENDANT);

12/05/2022: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5-DAY EVICTION SUMMONS - SERVED 11/18/2022 CHRISTOPHER BLANKENSHIP AKA CHRISTOPHER BRANDON BLANKENSHIP (DEFENDANT);

PLAINTIFF'S VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

12/05/2022: PLAINTIFF'S VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION (CLOSES)

12/12/2022: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION (CLOSES)

WRIT OF POSSESSION - ISSUED 12/14/2022

12/13/2022: WRIT OF POSSESSION - ISSUED 12/14/2022

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - SHERIFF'S RETURN POSTED 1/11/2023; CHRISTOPHER BLANKENSHIP (DEFENDANT);

01/13/2023: WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - SHERIFF'S RETURN POSTED 1/11/2023; CHRISTOPHER BLANKENSHIP (DEFENDANT);

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - SHERIFF'S RETURN POSTED 1/11/2023; CHRISTOPHER BLANKENSHIP (DEFENDANT);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION - ISSUED 12/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DispositionEVICTION RESIDENTIAL POSSESSION ONLY OR WITH DAMAGES UP TO $2500.00; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 11/10/2022; Disposition: DE03 - DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION (CLOSES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5-DAY EVICTION SUMMONS - SERVED 11/18/2022 CHRISTOPHER BLANKENSHIP AKA CHRISTOPHER BRANDON BLANKENSHIP (DEFENDANT);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY (ISSUED 12/7/2022-KBH); AS TO CHRISTOPHER BLANKENSHIP AKA CHRISTOPHER BRANDON BLAKENSHIP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN SERVED 11/18/2022; CHRISTOPHER BLANKENSHIP (DEFENDANT);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $195.00; Total Fee Paid: $195.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • FinancialReceipt #: 493201; Paid: 493201; Applied: $195.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AS TO CHRISTOPHER BLANKENSHIP A/K/A CHRISTOPHER BRANDON BLANKENSHIP (DEFENDANT); WITH FEE Receipt: 493201 Date: 11/10/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION - NO MONEY CLAIM Receipt: 493201 Date: 11/10/2022; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAR PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIEGEL MATTHEW EDWARD