This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/11/2020 at 16:03:06 (UTC).

SAFFAIE, PAYMAN M -vs- HALE, ERNELL et al

Case Summary

On 08/16/2018 SAFFAIE, PAYMAN M filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against HALE, ERNELL. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3031

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAFFAIE, PAYMAN M

Gainesville, FL 32601

Defendants

LOCKE, JESSICA

Gainesville, FL 32608

HALE, ERNELL

Gainesville, FL 32608

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION - DELINQUENT TENANT Receipt: 424350 Date: 08/16/2018; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

08/16/2018: COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION - DELINQUENT TENANT Receipt: 424350 Date: 08/16/2018; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

SUMMONS 5/20 DAY ISSUED/CLERK'S CERT. OF MAILING-SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; AS TO ERNELL HALE; (RTN TO PL 08/016/18-SRW)

08/16/2018: SUMMONS 5/20 DAY ISSUED/CLERK'S CERT. OF MAILING-SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; AS TO ERNELL HALE; (RTN TO PL 08/016/18-SRW)

SUMMONS 5/20 DAY ISSUED/CLERK'S CERT. OF MAILING-SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; AS TO JESSICA LOCKE; (RTN TO PL 08/16/18-SRW)

08/16/2018: SUMMONS 5/20 DAY ISSUED/CLERK'S CERT. OF MAILING-SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; AS TO JESSICA LOCKE; (RTN TO PL 08/16/18-SRW)

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS - UNEXECUTED ; JESSICA LOCKE

08/20/2018: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS - UNEXECUTED ; JESSICA LOCKE

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS - UNEXECUTED; ERNELL HALE

08/20/2018: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS - UNEXECUTED; ERNELL HALE

AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

08/23/2018: AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

ALIAS SUMMONS; JESSICA LOCKE (DEFENDANT);

08/23/2018: ALIAS SUMMONS; JESSICA LOCKE (DEFENDANT);

ALIAS SUMMONS; ERNELL HALE (DEFENDANT);

08/23/2018: ALIAS SUMMONS; ERNELL HALE (DEFENDANT);

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; JESSICA LOCKE (DEFENDANT);

08/23/2018: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; JESSICA LOCKE (DEFENDANT);

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; ERNELL HALE (DEFENDANT);

08/23/2018: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; ERNELL HALE (DEFENDANT);

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON ALIAS 5/20 SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT - SERVED 8/24/2018; ERNELL HALE

08/27/2018: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON ALIAS 5/20 SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT - SERVED 8/24/2018; ERNELL HALE

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON ALIAS 5/20 SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUB.SERVED 8/24/2018; JESSICA LOCKE

08/27/2018: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON ALIAS 5/20 SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUB.SERVED 8/24/2018; JESSICA LOCKE

MAIL RETURNED; ERNELL HALE

09/05/2018: MAIL RETURNED; ERNELL HALE

MAIL RETURNED; JESSICA LOCKE (DEFENDANT);

09/07/2018: MAIL RETURNED; JESSICA LOCKE (DEFENDANT);

FINAL SETTLEMENT; (EMAILED TO CC 9/10 NP)

09/10/2018: FINAL SETTLEMENT; (EMAILED TO CC 9/10 NP)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2018
  • DispositionEVICTION DELINQUENT TENANT; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 08/16/2018; Disposition: BH01- BEFORE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL SETTLEMENT; (EMAILED TO CC 9/10 NP)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED; JESSICA LOCKE (DEFENDANT);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED; ERNELL HALE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON ALIAS 5/20 SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUB.SERVED 8/24/2018; JESSICA LOCKE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON ALIAS 5/20 SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT - SERVED 8/24/2018; ERNELL HALE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 424727; Paid: $20.00; Applied: $20.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; ERNELL HALE (DEFENDANT);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; JESSICA LOCKE (DEFENDANT);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS FEE (34.041(1)(d) COUNTY CIVIL) Receipt: 424727 Date: 08/23/2018; Amount: $20.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS - UNEXECUTED; ERNELL HALE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS - UNEXECUTED ; JESSICA LOCKE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $225.00; Total Fee Paid: $225.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 424350; Paid: $210.00; Applied: $205.00; Refunded: $5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS 5/20 DAY ISSUED/CLERK'S CERT. OF MAILING-SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; AS TO JESSICA LOCKE; (RTN TO PL 08/16/18-SRW)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS 5/20 DAY ISSUED/CLERK'S CERT. OF MAILING-SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; AS TO ERNELL HALE; (RTN TO PL 08/016/18-SRW)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS FEE (34.041(1)(d) COUNTY CIVIL) Receipt: 424350 Date: 08/16/2018; Amount: $20.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION - DELINQUENT TENANT Receipt: 424350 Date: 08/16/2018; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less