Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 16:29:15 (UTC).

RUTLEDGE, MICHELLE KAY -VS- STEPNEY, KELVIN

Case Summary

On 03/09/2018 RUTLEDGE, MICHELLE KAY filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against STEPNEY, KELVIN. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0794

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RUTLEDGE, MICHELLE KAY

Respondent

STEPNEY, KELVIN

Midlothian, TX 76065

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MEADORS ESQ., MICHAEL

500 E University Ave Ste B

Gainesville, FL 32601

Respondent Attorney

CARLISLE ESQ., TRACEY DARR

2830 Nw 41St Street Ste L

Gainesville, FL 32606

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2018
  • DispositionANNULMENT; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 03/09/2018; Disposition: NJ01 - NON-JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF ANNULMENT (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION FOR ANNULMENT OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketE-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketPETITIONER'S MOTION FOR NO CONTACT ORDER AND OTHER RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW ; RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PETITION FOR ANNULMENT OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED; KELVIN STEPNEY (RESPONDENT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $418.00; Total Fee Paid: $418.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 415817; Paid: $418.00; Applied: $418.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE ; AS RO KELVIN STEPNEY; Receipt: 415817 Date: 03/09/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketE-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketPETITION FOR ANNULMENT Receipt: 415817 Date: 03/09/2018; Amount: $408.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEADORS ESQ., MICHAEL