This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 09/06/2021 at 16:08:38 (UTC).

REVOLUTIONS FL1 LLC -vs- PRICE-CROWELL, NEDDRA

Case Summary

On 08/09/2021 REVOLUTIONS FL1 LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against PRICE-CROWELL, NEDDRA. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2664

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REVOLUTIONS FL1 LLC

Defendant

PRICE-CROWELL, NEDDRA

Gainesville, FL 32607

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAYTER ESQ, JOHN F

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Attorney At Law, 1418 Nw 6 St

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STAY WRIT OF POSSESSION

09/03/2021: ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STAY WRIT OF POSSESSION

MOTION FOR STAY WITH CDC DECLORATION (SRL) (REOPEN)

09/03/2021: MOTION FOR STAY WITH CDC DECLORATION (SRL) (REOPEN)

MOTION FOR STAY (SRL) (REOPEN)

09/03/2021: MOTION FOR STAY (SRL) (REOPEN)

WRIT OF POSSESSION - ISSUED (09/01/2021-KBH)

08/31/2021: WRIT OF POSSESSION - ISSUED (09/01/2021-KBH)

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION (CLOSES)

08/30/2021: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION (CLOSES)

ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT,; SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT (SRL)

08/26/2021: ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT,; SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT (SRL)

MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ; ; ; (REOPEN)

08/23/2021: MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ; ; ; (REOPEN)

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AS TO POSSESSION & DEFAULT AS TO POSSESSION ISSUED 8/25/2021 AS TO NEDDRA PRICE-CROWELL / CMW

08/23/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT AS TO POSSESSION & DEFAULT AS TO POSSESSION ISSUED 8/25/2021 AS TO NEDDRA PRICE-CROWELL / CMW

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

08/23/2021: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS ; POSTED 8/13/2021 AS TO NEDDRA PRICE-CROWELL

08/16/2021: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS ; POSTED 8/13/2021 AS TO NEDDRA PRICE-CROWELL

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

08/11/2021: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

08/09/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

SUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE; NEDDRA PRICE-CROWELL (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 473532 Date: 08/10/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

08/09/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE; NEDDRA PRICE-CROWELL (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 473532 Date: 08/10/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION WITH MONEY DAMAGES $2,500 OR LESS Receipt: 473532 Date: 08/10/2021; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

08/09/2021: COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION WITH MONEY DAMAGES $2,500 OR LESS Receipt: 473532 Date: 08/10/2021; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2021
  • DispositionEVICTION RESIDENTIAL POSSESSION ONLY OR WITH DAMAGES UP TO $2500.00; Status: 99 CLOSED; Status Date: 09/03/2021; Disposition: 99CLOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 474634; Paid: $1.00; Applied: $1.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DENYING MOTION TO STAY WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR STAY WITH CDC DECLORATION (SRL) (REOPEN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCase Reopened this date 9/3/2021; (ON MOTION TO STAY WRIT OF POSSESSION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCOPIES (CASE RECEIPTING) Receipt: 474634 Date: 09/03/2021; Amount: $1.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR STAY (SRL) (REOPEN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION - ISSUED (09/01/2021-KBH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DispositionEVICTION RESIDENTIAL POSSESSION ONLY OR WITH DAMAGES UP TO $2500.00; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 08/09/2021; Disposition: DE03 - DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ; ; ; (REOPEN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT AS TO POSSESSION & DEFAULT AS TO POSSESSION ISSUED 8/25/2021 AS TO NEDDRA PRICE-CROWELL / CMW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS ; POSTED 8/13/2021 AS TO NEDDRA PRICE-CROWELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 473532; Paid: $195.00; Applied: $195.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $197.00; Total Fee Paid: $197.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE; NEDDRA PRICE-CROWELL (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 473532 Date: 08/10/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION WITH MONEY DAMAGES $2,500 OR LESS Receipt: 473532 Date: 08/10/2021; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAYTER ESQ, JOHN F