Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/06/2020 at 02:08:51 (UTC).

REDBALL RECOVERY INC -VS- WHITING, ZEPHANIAH

Case Summary

On 10/18/2017 REDBALL RECOVERY INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WHITING, ZEPHANIAH. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RAWLS, MESHON T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3312

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RAWLS, MESHON T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REDBALL RECOVERY INC

Defendant

WHITING, ZEPHANIAH

Hollywood, FL 33020

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAMSON ESQ, DAVID E

1418 Nw 6 St

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF DISMISSAL (SC) (CLOSES)

06/18/2018: ORDER OF DISMISSAL (SC) (CLOSES)

PRETRIAL RESULTS -PLAINTIFF PRESENT/DEFENDANT(S) NO SHOW. / ORDER OF DISMISSAL

06/15/2018: PRETRIAL RESULTS -PLAINTIFF PRESENT/DEFENDANT(S) NO SHOW. / ORDER OF DISMISSAL

(4th PLURIES ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL ; Receipt: 419705 Date: 05/23/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

05/23/2018: (4th PLURIES ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL ; Receipt: 419705 Date: 05/23/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE OR DISMISS AND ORDER SETTING CASE FOR CONTINUED PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

05/22/2018: ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE OR DISMISS AND ORDER SETTING CASE FOR CONTINUED PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

PRETRIAL RESULTS -PLAINTIFF PRESENT/DEFENDANT(S) NO SHOW/ CONT. FOR SERVICE ON LOS DOCKET- 6/15/2018 @ 9:30 A.M.; ****JA TO PREPARE ORDER****

05/18/2018: PRETRIAL RESULTS -PLAINTIFF PRESENT/DEFENDANT(S) NO SHOW/ CONT. FOR SERVICE ON LOS DOCKET- 6/15/2018 @ 9:30 A.M.; ****JA TO PREPARE ORDER****

(THIRD PLURIES ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL ; Receipt: 417401 Date: 04/11/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

04/10/2018: (THIRD PLURIES ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL ; Receipt: 417401 Date: 04/11/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

RESERVICE INFORMATION REQUEST

04/10/2018: RESERVICE INFORMATION REQUEST

(2ND PLURIES) SHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - UNSERVED

03/28/2018: (2ND PLURIES) SHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - UNSERVED

RESERVICE INFORMATION REQUEST

03/13/2018: RESERVICE INFORMATION REQUEST

CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED- UNCLAIMED; (PLURIES PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS)

01/31/2018: CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED- UNCLAIMED; (PLURIES PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS)

(PLURIES ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL; Receipt: 411887 Date: 12/21/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

12/20/2017: (PLURIES ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL; Receipt: 411887 Date: 12/21/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

RESERVICE INFORMATION REQUEST

12/20/2017: RESERVICE INFORMATION REQUEST

(ALIAS) SHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - UNSERVED

12/11/2017: (ALIAS) SHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - UNSERVED

RESERVICE INFORMATION REQUEST

11/01/2017: RESERVICE INFORMATION REQUEST

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE (SC)

11/01/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE (SC)

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

10/23/2017: ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

10/18/2017: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND/OR COSTS

10/18/2017: MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND/OR COSTS

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2018
  • DispositionCONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS $500.01 TO $2500.00; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 10/18/2017; Disposition: BH01- BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL (SC) (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • HearingLACK OF SERVICE / RESERVICE; Judge: RAWLS, MESHON T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • HearingPRETRIAL/LACK OF SERVICE; Judge: RAWLS, MESHON T; Result: RESCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL RESULTS -PLAINTIFF PRESENT/DEFENDANT(S) NO SHOW. / ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 419705; Paid: $10.00; Applied: $10.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(4th PLURIES ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL ; Receipt: 419705 Date: 05/23/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF LACK OF SERVICE RESERVICE (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: LACK OF SERVICE / RESERVICE ; Date: 06/15/2018 Time: 9:30 am ; Judge: FERRERO - DIV IV, DENISE R Location: COURTROOM 2-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE OR DISMISS AND ORDER SETTING CASE FOR CONTINUED PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(ISSUED) ALIAS SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 409737 Date: 11/01/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • FinancialReceipt # 409207; Paid: $185.00; Applied: $185.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 12/15/2017 Time: 9:00 am ; Judge: VAN VORST - DIV IV, KRISTINE Location: COURTROOM 2-A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $235.00; Total Fee Paid: $235.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 409207 Date: 10/20/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND/OR COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM ($500.01 - $2500.00) Receipt: 409207 Date: 10/20/2017; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REDBALL RECOVERY INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Williamson, David Earl