Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/06/2020 at 19:51:44 (UTC).

REDBALL RECOVERY INC -VS- WALTERS, COURY

Case Summary

On 11/21/2017 REDBALL RECOVERY INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WALTERS, COURY. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RAWLS, MESHON T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3668

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RAWLS, MESHON T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REDBALL RECOVERY INC

Defendant

WALTERS, COURY

Gainesville, FL 32608

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAMSON ESQ, DAVID E

1418 Nw 6 St

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT (SC) (CLOSES)

05/07/2018: FINAL JUDGMENT (SC) (CLOSES)

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-PAYMENT ON STIPULATION (REOPEN)

05/03/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-PAYMENT ON STIPULATION (REOPEN)

STIPULATION (CLOSES)

01/12/2018: STIPULATION (CLOSES)

PRETRIAL RESULTS -PLAINTIFF PRESENT/DEFENDANT(S) NO SHOW.

01/12/2018: PRETRIAL RESULTS -PLAINTIFF PRESENT/DEFENDANT(S) NO SHOW.

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SUBSTITUTE SERVED 12/02/2017

12/13/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SUBSTITUTE SERVED 12/02/2017

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

11/22/2017: ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

MOTION TO TAX ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS

11/21/2017: MOTION TO TAX ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

11/21/2017: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL ; Receipt: 410611 Date: 11/21/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

11/21/2017: (ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL ; Receipt: 410611 Date: 11/21/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

COPY OF ASSIGNMENT ORDER 9.15 DATED 09202017

11/21/2017: COPY OF ASSIGNMENT ORDER 9.15 DATED 09202017

STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($500.01 - $2500.00) Receipt: 410611 Date: 11/21/2017; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

11/21/2017: STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($500.01 - $2500.00) Receipt: 410611 Date: 11/21/2017; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2018
  • DispositionCONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS $500.01 TO $2500.00; Status: 99 CLOSED; Status Date: 05/03/2018; Disposition: 99CLOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Docket99 CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT (SC) (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-PAYMENT ON STIPULATION (REOPEN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • DocketCase Reopened this date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • HearingSMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE; Judge: RAWLS, MESHON T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DispositionCONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS $500.01 TO $2500.00; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 11/21/2017; Disposition: BH01- BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL RESULTS -PLAINTIFF PRESENT/DEFENDANT(S) NO SHOW.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SUBSTITUTE SERVED 12/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $185.00; Total Fee Paid: $185.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • FinancialReceipt # 410611; Paid: $185.00; Applied: $185.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO TAX ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL ; Receipt: 410611 Date: 11/21/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 01/12/2018 Time: 9:00 am ; Judge: VAN VORST - DIV IV, KRISTINE Location: COURTROOM 2-A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF ASSIGNMENT ORDER 9.15 DATED 09202017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM ($500.01 - $2500.00) Receipt: 410611 Date: 11/21/2017; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REDBALL RECOVERY INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Williamson, David Earl