This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/22/2023 at 06:08:34 (UTC).

REDBALL RECOVERY INC -VS- COX III, CLEVELAND

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 REDBALL RECOVERY INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against COX III, CLEVELAND. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is VAN VORST, KRISTINE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0063

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Judge Details

Judge

VAN VORST, KRISTINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REDBALL RECOVERY INC

Defendant

COX III, CLEVELAND

Gainesville, FL 32606

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAMSON ESQ, DAVID E

1418 Nw 6 St

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) Receipt: 495513 Date: 01/09/2023; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

01/06/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) Receipt: 495513 Date: 01/09/2023; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

01/06/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL ISSUED BY CLERK - CLEVELAND COX III; ; ; ; ; ; ; ; ; ; ; ; Receipt: 495513 Date: 01/09/2023; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

01/06/2023: SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL ISSUED BY CLERK - CLEVELAND COX III; ; ; ; ; ; ; ; ; ; ; ; Receipt: 495513 Date: 01/09/2023; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

MOTION TO TAX ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS (REOPEN)

01/06/2023: MOTION TO TAX ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS (REOPEN)

SHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - UNSERVED; CLEVELAND COX III (DEFENDANT);

01/24/2023: SHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - UNSERVED; CLEVELAND COX III (DEFENDANT);

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (CLOSES)

02/10/2023: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (CLOSES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2023
  • HearingSMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE; Judge: VAN VORST, KRISTINE; Result: EVENT CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DispositionSMALL CLAIM $501 TO $2500; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 01/09/2023; Disposition: BH01- BEFORE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (CLOSES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - UNSERVED; CLEVELAND COX III (DEFENDANT);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $185.00; Total Fee Paid: $185.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • FinancialReceipt #: 495513; Paid: 495513; Applied: $185.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 02/17/2023 Time: 9:30 am ; Judge: VAN VORST - DIV V, KRISTINE Location: COURTROOM 2-B; ; Result: EVENT CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO TAX ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS (REOPEN)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL ISSUED BY CLERK - CLEVELAND COX III; ; ; ; ; ; ; ; ; ; ; ; Receipt: 495513 Date: 01/09/2023; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) Receipt: 495513 Date: 01/09/2023; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less