This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 03/24/2023 at 04:43:59 (UTC).

REDBALL RECOVERY INC -VS- ARMAGOST, BLAIR

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 REDBALL RECOVERY INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ARMAGOST, BLAIR. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is VAN VORST, KRISTINE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0455

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

VAN VORST, KRISTINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REDBALL RECOVERY INC

Defendant

ARMAGOST, BLAIR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAMSON ESQ, DAVID E

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM; Receipt: 496686 Date: 01/31/2023; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

01/30/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM; Receipt: 496686 Date: 01/31/2023; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

01/30/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL ; Receipt: 496686 Date: 01/31/2023; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

01/30/2023: (ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL ; Receipt: 496686 Date: 01/31/2023; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

MOTION TO TAX ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS ; ; ; (REOPEN)

01/30/2023: MOTION TO TAX ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS ; ; ; (REOPEN)

SHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - SERVED 2/6/2023; BLAIR ARMAGOST (DEFENDANT);

02/07/2023: SHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - SERVED 2/6/2023; BLAIR ARMAGOST (DEFENDANT);

COURT ACTION MEMO PRETRIAL RESULTS

03/03/2023: COURT ACTION MEMO PRETRIAL RESULTS

STIPULATION

03/06/2023: STIPULATION

ORDER ADOPTING STIPULATION AND DISMISSING ACTION (CLOSED)

03/17/2023: ORDER ADOPTING STIPULATION AND DISMISSING ACTION (CLOSED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2023
  • DispositionSMALL CLAIM $501 TO $2500; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 01/31/2023; Disposition: HH01 - AFTER HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ADOPTING STIPULATION AND DISMISSING ACTION (CLOSED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • HearingSMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE; Judge: VAN VORST, KRISTINE; Result: HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ACTION MEMO PRETRIAL RESULTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - SERVED 2/6/2023; BLAIR ARMAGOST (DEFENDANT);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $185.00; Total Fee Paid: $185.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialReceipt #: 496686; Paid: 496686; Applied: $185.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO TAX ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS ; ; ; (REOPEN)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL ; Receipt: 496686 Date: 01/31/2023; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 03/03/2023 Time: 9:30 am ; Judge: VAN VORST - DIV V, KRISTINE Location: COURTROOM 2-B; ; Result: HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Receipt: 496686 Date: 01/31/2023; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less