This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 08/26/2021 at 12:23:30 (UTC).

RE: MARRIAGE OF: WEAVER, MICHAEL SEAN AND WEAVER, NICOLE TERESA

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 RE MARRIAGE OF WEAVER, MICHAEL SEAN AND WEAVER, NICOLE TERESA was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1823

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

WEAVER, MICHAEL SEAN

WEAVER, NICOLE TERESA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

CURCIO ESQ, JENNIFER KIRKHART

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Attorney At Law, 2831 Nw 41 St Suite E

Gainesville, FL 32606

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketORDER SCHEDULING NON-JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketNOTICE ACTION AT ISSUE AND READY FOR TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 471809; Paid: $408.00; Applied: $408.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $408.00; Total Fee Paid: $408.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketWAIVER AND ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE Receipt: 471809 Date: 07/02/2021; Amount: $408.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CURCIO ESQ., JENNIFER KIRKHART