Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/10/2020 at 13:59:03 (UTC).

RE: MARRIAGE OF: THORTON, VERNON DALE AND THORTON, DESSIE

Case Summary

On 06/15/2018 RE MARRIAGE OF THORTON, VERNON DALE AND THORTON, DESSIE was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KREIDER, DAVID P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1957

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KREIDER, DAVID P

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

THORTON, VERNON DALE

Hawthorne, FL 32640

THORTON, DESSIE

THORNTON, VERNON DALE

Hawthorne, FL 32640

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2018
  • DispositionDISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 06/15/2018; Disposition: HH01 - AFTER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • HearingPRO SE HEARINGS; Judge: KREIDER, DAVID P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: PRO SE HEARINGS ; Date: 12/10/2018 Time: 9:00 am ; Judge: HULSLANDER - DIV DR4, VICTOR L Location: COURTROOM 3-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • HearingPRO SE HEARINGS; Judge: KREIDER, DAVID P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: PRO SE HEARINGS ; Date: 10/22/2018 Time: 9:00 am ; Judge: HULSLANDER - DIV DR4, VICTOR L Location: COURTROOM 3-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 421257; Paid: $410.00; Applied: $408.00; Refunded: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketAGREEMENT FOR DEFERRED PAYMENT OF COURT COSTS- CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS / CLERK'S DETERMINATION (NOT INDIGENT); VERNON DALE THORTON (HUSBAND);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketFACT INFORMATION SHEET- INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE Receipt: 421257 Date: 06/21/2018; Amount: $408.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketPAYMENT PLAN FEE CIRCUIT CIVIL (1 TIME FEE) Receipt: 420928 Date: 06/15/2018; Amount: $25.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less