Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 04/19/2021 at 16:02:02 (UTC).

RE: MARRIAGE OF: ST LUISE, JOHNATHON DAVID AND MAYER, CIARA ELIZABETH

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 RE MARRIAGE OF ST LUISE, JOHNATHON DAVID AND MAYER, CIARA ELIZABETH was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GROEB, ROBERT K. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0789

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GROEB, ROBERT K

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

MAYER, CIARA ELIZABETH

Newberry, FL 32669

ST LUISE, JOHNATHON DAVID

Middleburg, FL 32068

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2021
  • HearingPRO SE HEARINGS; Judge: GROEB, ROBERT K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: PRO SE HEARINGS ; Date: 05/19/2021 Time: 3:00 pm ; Judge: GROEB, ROBERT K Location: COURTROOM 3-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketORDER SCHEDULING HEARING BY VIDEO CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND WAIVER; JOHNATHON DAVID ST LUISE (HUSBAND);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $408.00; Total Fee Paid: $408.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 467657; Paid: $408.00; Applied: $408.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT OF HUSBAND; JOHNATHON DAVID ST LUISE (HUSBAND);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; JOHNATHON DAVID ST LUISE (HUSBAND);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; JOHNATHON DAVID ST LUISE (HUSBAND);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED; CIARA ELIZABETH MAYER (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF MANDATORY DISCLOSURE; JOHNATHON DAVID ST LUISE (HUSBAND);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; CIARA ELIZABETH MAYER (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING ADDRESS AND EMAIL ADDRESS; CIARA ELIZABETH MAYER (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; CIARA ELIZABETH MAYER (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF MANDATORY DISCLOSURE; CIARA ELIZABETH MAYER (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY COURT ORDER; JOHNATHON DAVID ST LUISE (HUSBAND);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY COURT ORDER; CIARA ELIZABETH MAYER (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET; CIARA ELIZABETH MAYER (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE Receipt: 467657 Date: 03/22/2021; CIARA ELIZABETH MAYER (WIFE);; Amount: $408.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less