Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/11/2020 at 14:20:06 (UTC).

RE: MARRIAGE OF: SMALE, BRANDEN AND SMALE, KIMBERLY

Case Summary

On 08/09/2018 RE MARRIAGE OF SMALE, BRANDEN AND SMALE, KIMBERLY was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2620

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VIDEON-SMALE, KIMBERLY

Respondents

SMALE, BRANDEN C

ELECTRICAL CRAFTSMANSHIP INC

C/O Branden Smale, 13327 Sw Williston Rd

Micanopy, FL 32667

Not Yet Classified

SMALE, BRANDEN

Micanopy, FL 32618

SMALE, KIMBERLY

Newberry, FL 32669

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified, Petitioner and Respondent Attorneys

LEE ESQ, TEE HOA

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Attorney At Law, 4707 Nw 53 Ave Suite A

Gainesville, FL 32653

ISENBERG ESQ, ADRIANE M.

912 Nw 56 Ter Ste A

Gainesville, FL 32605

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2019
  • DispositionDISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 08/09/2018; Disposition: NJ01 - NON-JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketINCOME WITHHOLDING ORDER FOR SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketACTIVITY TRANSFERRED TO DEPOSITORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketORDER SCHEDULING NON-JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketPARENTING PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketORDER SCHEDULING NON-JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING -

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2018
  • DocketE-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • DocketCOURTVIEW CIVIL OVERPAYMENT>$10.00 Receipt: 424491 Date: 08/20/2018; Amount: $97.50; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 424018; Paid: $408.00; Applied: $408.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $810.50; Total Fee Paid: $810.50; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ACT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketE-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE Receipt: 424018 Date: 08/10/2018; Amount: $408.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEE , TEE HOA