This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 08/23/2021 at 20:03:36 (UTC).

RE: MARRIAGE OF: SIEBEIN, GARY WALTER AND SIEBEIN, MEGGIN JUSTINE

Case Summary

On 03/18/2021 RE MARRIAGE OF SIEBEIN, GARY WALTER AND SIEBEIN, MEGGIN JUSTINE was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0760

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

SIEBEIN, MEGGIN JUSTINE

Gainesville, FL 32605

SIEBEIN, GARY WALTER

Gainesville, FL 32607

MEEDS, MEGGIN JUSTINE

Gainesville, FL 32605

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

CURCIO ESQ, JENNIFER KIRKHART

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Attorney At Law, 2831 Nw 41 St Suite E

Gainesville, FL 32606

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO REDIRECT PAYMENTS TO NEW TITLE IV-D CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DispositionDISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 03/18/2021; Disposition: NJ01 - NON-JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketORDER SETTING DATE FOR NON-JURY TRIAL; APRIL 28, 2021 @ 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (SHORT FORM) AS TO; MEGGIN JUSTINE SIEBEIN (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINE WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (LONG FORM) AS TO; GARY WALTER SIEBEIN (HUSBAND);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE THAT ACTION IS AT ISSUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING ; -CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION OF PARENTING COURSE; MEGGIN JUSTINE SIEBEIN (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 467588; Paid: $408.00; Applied: $408.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; GARY WALTER SIEBEIN (HUSBAND); MEGGIN JUSTINE SIEBEIN (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $408.00; Total Fee Paid: $408.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketWAIVER AND ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE; GARY WALTER SIEBEIN (HUSBAND);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY COURT ORDER; MEGGIN JUSTINE SIEBEIN (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET; JENNIFER KIRKHART CURCIO ESQ (Attorney) on behalf of MEGGIN JUSTINE SIEBEIN (WIFE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE Receipt: 467588 Date: 03/22/2021; JENNIFER KIRKHART CURCIO ESQ (Attorney) on behalf of MEGGIN JUSTINE SIEBEIN (WIFE); Amount: $408.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CURCIO ESQ., JENNIFER KIRKHART