Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/10/2020 at 23:16:59 (UTC).

RE: MARRIAGE OF: SANDERS, JASON PAUL AND SANDERS, REBECCA CAROLE BURGESS

Case Summary

On 05/25/2018 RE MARRIAGE OF SANDERS, JASON PAUL AND SANDERS, REBECCA CAROLE BURGESS was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1724

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

SANDERS, REBECCA CAROLE BURGESS

Gainesville, FL 32608

BURGESS, REBECCA CAROLE KAMESWARAN

Gainesville, FL 32608

SANDERS, JASON PAUL

Gainesville, FL 32608

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; JASON PAUL SANDERS (HUSBAND);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • DispositionDISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Status: 99 CLOSED; Status Date: 07/31/2019; Disposition: 99CLOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • Docket99 CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • DocketORDER ON FORMER WIFE'S MOTION FOR CIVIL CONTEMPT/ENFORCEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • FinancialReceipt # 444681; Paid: $3.50; Applied: $3.50; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; JASON PAUL SANDERS (HUSBAND);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketOATH, ATTEST FEE Receipt: 444681 Date: 09/23/2019; Amount: $3.50; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketORDER DIRECTING FORMER HUSBAND TO FILE FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • FinancialReceipt # 441992; Paid: $3.50; Applied: $3.50; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE; JASON PAUL SANDERS (HUSBAND);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Amount: $408.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketE-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less