Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 04/19/2021 at 16:04:57 (UTC).

RE: MARRIAGE OF: RUSH, MICHAEL A AND RUSH, JAMIE

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 RE MARRIAGE OF RUSH, MICHAEL A AND RUSH, JAMIE was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0797

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

RUSH, JAMIE

Gainesville, FL 32605

RUSH, MICHAEL A

Gainesville, FL 32609

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

MCDANIEL ESQ, MAURICE T

18581 High Springs Main St Ste 20

High Springs, FL 32643

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED 4/9/2021; MICHAEL A RUSH (HUSBAND);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 468131; Paid: $10.00; Applied: $10.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 468131 Date: 04/02/2021; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS A RETURN OF SERVICE HAS NOT BEEN FILED ON PREVIOUS ISSUED SUMMONS); Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 467717; Paid: $418.00; Applied: $418.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $428.00; Total Fee Paid: $428.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE; MICHAEL A RUSH (HUSBAND); Receipt: 467717 Date: 03/23/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • Docket(E-REDACTED) UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ACT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; JAMIE RUSH (WIFE); Receipt: 467717 Date: 03/23/2021; Amount: $408.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCANIEL MAURICE T