Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/11/2020 at 15:53:41 (UTC).

RE: MARRIAGE OF: ROBINSON, CORBIN VANCE AND ROBINSON, MORGAN KENDALL

Case Summary

On 08/16/2018 RE MARRIAGE OF ROBINSON, CORBIN VANCE AND ROBINSON, MORGAN KENDALL was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KREIDER, DAVID P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2707

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KREIDER, DAVID P

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

ROBINSON, MORGAN KENDALL

Gainesville, FL 32605

ROBINSON, CORBIN VANCE

Salt Lake City, UT 84117

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE, SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, EVIDENTIARY HEARING, AND/OR FINAL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketCase Reopened this date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO REDUCE CHILD SUPPORT AMOUNT (REOPEN); MORGAN KENDALL ROBINSON (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS ARREARAGE OF CHILD SUPPORT (REOPEN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketNOTICE THAT ACTION IS AT ISSUE AND MOTION FOR HEARING/NON-JURY TRIAL/ WITH ( UNSIGNED) ORDER SETTING DATED FOR HEARING/NON-JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT REGARDING DIRECT CHILD SUPPORT PAYMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR CREDIT FOR DIRECT CHILD SUPPORT PAYMENTS (REOPEN); MORGAN KENDALL ROBINSON (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS; MORGAN KENDALL ROBINSON (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DELINQUENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DispositionDISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 08/16/2018; Disposition: NJ01 - NON-JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketMOTION TO DEVIATE FROM CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES; MORGAN KENDALL ROBINSON (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketPARENTING PLAN; CORBIN VANCE ROBINSON (HUSBAND); MORGAN KENDALL ROBINSON (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ACT AFFIDAVIT; MORGAN KENDALL ROBINSON (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; CORBIN VANCE ROBINSON (HUSBAND); MORGAN KENDALL ROBINSON (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; MORGAN KENDALL ROBINSON (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE; MORGAN KENDALL ROBINSON (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; MORGAN KENDALL ROBINSON (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY COURT ORDER; MORGAN KENDALL ROBINSON (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET; MORGAN KENDALL ROBINSON (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE Receipt: 424332 Date: 08/16/2018; Amount: $408.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less