This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 08/19/2021 at 09:20:56 (UTC).

RE: MARRIAGE OF: PRICE III, HAROLD AND PRICE, BONNIE

Case Summary

On 01/29/2021 RE MARRIAGE OF PRICE III, HAROLD AND PRICE, BONNIE was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0286

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

PRICE, BONNIE

Gainesville, FL 32608

PRICE III, HAROLD

Gainesville, FL 32609

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

RAMSEY ESQ, JOHN A

537 Ne 1 Street, Suite 3

Gainesville, FL 32601

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2021
  • DispositionDISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 01/29/2021; Disposition: NJ01 - NON-JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH NO PROPERTY OR DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILDREN (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketALERT CANCELLED; INDIGENT canceled on: 06/01/2021 ; For: PRICE, BONNIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketHEARING DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketORDER SETTING DATE FOR FINAL HEARING; APRIL 26, 2021 @ 3:00PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNOTICE THAT ACTION IS AT ISSUE AND MOTION FOR HEARING/NON-JURY TRIAL/ WITH ( UNSIGNED) ORDER SETTING DATED FOR HEARING/NON-JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketDEFAULT - CLERK UNABLE TO ENTER DEFAULT AS IT IS FOR THE COURT TO SIGN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketDEFAULT (BY THE COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT ; (NO PROPOSED DEFAULT FILED WITH THE MOTION)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS - CLERK UNABLE TO DETERMINE - PARAGRAPH #5 IS INCOMPLETE AS TO THE MOTOR VEHICLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS UNISSUED - FEE OWED; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; BONNIE PRICE (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketPERMISSION TO USE E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF CHILDREN BORN / NOT BORN DURING THE MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Amount: $408.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAMSEY JR ESQ, JOHN A