Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/04/2020 at 13:31:17 (UTC).

RE: MARRIAGE OF: MCINTOSH JR, THOMAS PORTER AND MCINTOSH, JENNIFER LEE BAUR

Case Summary

On 04/28/2017 RE MARRIAGE OF MCINTOSH JR, THOMAS PORTER AND MCINTOSH, JENNIFER LEE BAUR was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1521

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

MCINTOSH, JENNIFER LEE BAUR

Gainesville, FL 32606

MCINTOSH JR, THOMAS PORTER

Gainesville, FL 32607

LEE, JENNIFER

Gainesville, FL 32606

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

HASWELL ESQ, LESLIE SMITH

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Attorney At Law, 2830 Nw 41 St Ste K

Gainesville, FL 32606

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2017
  • DispositionDISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 04/28/2017; Disposition: NJ01 - NON-JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • DocketAMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • DocketACCEPTANCE, WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS, AND ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $408.00; Total Fee Paid: $408.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • FinancialReceipt # 401127; Paid: $408.00; Applied: $408.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE Receipt: 401127 Date: 04/28/2017; Amount: $408.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less