Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/05/2020 at 01:32:20 (UTC).

RE: MARRIAGE OF: KURIATNYK, RICHARD AND KURIATNYK, NAOMI

Case Summary

On 08/11/2017 RE MARRIAGE OF KURIATNYK, RICHARD AND KURIATNYK, NAOMI was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2786

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

KURIATNYK, NAOMI

Gainesville, FL 32607

KURIATNYK, RICHARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

CARLISLE, TRACEY DARR

2830 Nw 41St Street Ste L

Gainesville, FL 32606

HERTZ, DARBY

618 Ne 1St Street

Gainesville, FL 32601

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketJUDGES NOTES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketAGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DispositionDISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 08/11/2017; Disposition: NJ01 - NON-JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketACTIVITY TRANSFERRED TO DEPOSITORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • DocketAGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • DocketORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 422513; Paid: $120.00; Applied: $120.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketCOLLECTION PAYMENT RECEIPT AS TO NAOMI KURIATNYK

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • FinancialReceipt # 406205; Paid: $418.00; Applied: $418.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $658.00; Total Fee Paid: $658.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 406205 Date: 08/14/2017; NAOMI KURIATNYK (WIFE);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINSTRATION 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketHUSBANDS PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND RELATED RELIEF Receipt: 406205 Date: 08/14/2017; Amount: $408.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARLISLE ESQ., TRACEY DARR

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HERTZ, DARBY