Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/10/2020 at 02:57:33 (UTC).

RE: MARRIAGE OF: JORDAN, BOBBY AND INMAN, CAYLEIGH

Case Summary

On 06/07/2018 RE MARRIAGE OF JORDAN, BOBBY AND INMAN, CAYLEIGH was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KREIDER, DAVID P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1849

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KREIDER, DAVID P

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

INMAN, CAYLEIGH

Gainesville, FL 32641

JORDAN, BOBBY

Ft Pierce, FL 34951

JORDAN, CAYLEIGH DANIELLE

Gainesville, FL 32641

Intervenor

FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE OBO

Pam Schneider, 2041 Se 1St Street

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

STIMPSON ESQ, ELIKA O

309 Ne 1St St

Gainesville, FL 32601

Intervenor Attorney

SCHNEIDER ESQ, PAMELA A

208 Se 1 St

Gainesville, FL 32601

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketSTATE DEPARTMENT CHANGED ADDRESS REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF TERMINATION OF IV-D SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT/CERTIFICATE OF DELINQUENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketJUDGMENT/CERTIFICATE OF DELINQUENCY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED AS TO CAYLEIGH D JORDAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF DELINQUENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DispositionDISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 06/07/2018; Disposition: DE03 - DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketJUDGE'S HEARING NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketALERT CANCELLED; INDIGENT canceled on: 03/04/2019 ; For: INMAN, CAYLEIGH

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketMOTION FOR PATERNITY TESTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED/DISCLAIMER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketPERMISSION TO USE E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN); Amount: $408.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketOATH, ATTEST FEE Receipt: 420430 Date: 06/07/2018; Amount: $28.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCOPIES FEE - NON-COURT DOCUMENTS Receipt: 420430 Date: 06/07/2018; Amount: $12.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHNEIDER, PAMELA A