Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/07/2020 at 16:19:05 (UTC).

RE: MARRIAGE OF: JOHNSON, RYAN P AND JOHNSON, MINDY

Case Summary

On 11/08/2017 RE MARRIAGE OF JOHNSON, RYAN P AND JOHNSON, MINDY was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3721

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

JOHNSON, MINDY

JOHNSON, RYAN P

Lake City, FL 32055

CARTER, MINDY MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

LOPEZ ESQ, CHRISTY

5216 Sw 91 Terr Ste 101

Gainesville, FL 32608

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2018
  • DocketEVIDENCE WORKSHEET - EXHIBITS HOUSED IN VAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DispositionDISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 11/08/2017; Disposition: DE03 - DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketJUDGES NOTES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketORDER SCHEDULING NON-JURY TRIAL - 2/15/18 @ 2:45 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketMOTION/ REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AND DEFAULT- ISSUED (01/04/2018 CLERK ENTERED DEFAULT AS TO: RYAN P JOHNSON (HUSBAND);;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED 12/14/17; RYAN P JOHNSON (HUSBAND);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketALERT ISSUED; INDIGENT issued on: 11/15/2017 ; For: JOHNSON, MINDY ; Bond Amt: ; Bond Type:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION OF INDIGENCY - INDIGENT; MINDY JOHNSON (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE OF WIFE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketE-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Amount: $408.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketLETTER (BILLING NOTICE FOR FILING FEES); ; Civil Billing Letter; Sent on: 11/08/2017 14:31:58.50

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOPEZ, CHRISTY