Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/12/2020 at 13:33:19 (UTC).

RE: MARRIAGE OF: HUEY JR, JOHN E AND HUEY, ELYSE

Case Summary

On 10/03/2018 RE MARRIAGE OF HUEY JR, JOHN E AND HUEY, ELYSE was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3316

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified and Petitioners

HUEY JR, JOHN E

Jacksonville, FL 32256

HUEY, ELYSE

Not Yet Classified and Respondent

HUEY, ELYSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

FOLDS ESQ, ALLISON E

527 E University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

HERTZ ESQ., DARBY F.

618 Ne First St

Gainesville, FL 32601

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketMEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketAMENDED FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT AS OF JANUARY 8, 2020; JOHN E HUEY JR (HUSBAND);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF WIFE'S SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • Docket2ND AMENDED FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketORDER RE-SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE; 1/28/2020 @ 10:15AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketORDER SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE - 9/16/2019 @ 9:30 AM, RM 408

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketORDER ON STIPULATED MOTION TO CONTINUE NON-JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2018
  • DocketACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 426722; Paid: $418.00; Applied: $418.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $713.00; Total Fee Paid: $713.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 426722 Date: 10/04/2018; JOHN E HUEY JR (HUSBAND);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketE-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE Receipt: 426722 Date: 10/04/2018; Amount: $408.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FOLDS ESQ, ALLISON E

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HERTZ, DARBY