Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 05/12/2021 at 05:06:34 (UTC).

RE: MARRIAGE OF: HALL, SCOTT ALLEN AND HALL, HEATHER LYNN HORNE

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 RE MARRIAGE OF HALL, SCOTT ALLEN AND HALL, HEATHER LYNN HORNE was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0995

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

HALL, SCOTT ALLEN

HALL, HEATHER LYNN HORNE

Tampa, FL 33612

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

ROBINSON ESQ, TOM

240 Nw 76Th Dr Ste D

Gainesville, FL 32607

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2021
  • DispositionDISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 04/12/2021; Disposition: NJ01 - NON-JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE THAT ACTION IS AT ISSUE AND READY FOR TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT OF HUSBAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $408.00; Total Fee Paid: $408.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 468441; Paid: $408.00; Applied: $408.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketWIFE'S FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketANSWER, WAIVER, AND REQUEST FOR COPY OF ; FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; AS TO HEATHER LYNN HORNE HALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; AS TO SCOTT ALLEN HALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH NO PROPERTY AND NO DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN) ; Receipt: 468441 Date: 04/12/2021; Amount: $408.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBINSON ESQ, TOM