Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 05/10/2021 at 16:07:54 (UTC).

RE: MARRIAGE OF: HALL, JORDAN M AND HALL, PAIGE

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 RE MARRIAGE OF HALL, JORDAN M AND HALL, PAIGE was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1003

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

HALL, JORDAN M

HALL, PAIGE

Gainesville, FL 32608

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

GREAGOR ESQ, ITASCA M

1330 Nw 6Th Street Ste D

Gainesville, FL 32601

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED 4/26/2021; PAIGE HALL (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED 4/26/2021; PAIGE HALL (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $418.00; Total Fee Paid: $418.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 468480; Paid: $418.00; Applied: $418.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • Docket20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO PAIGE HALL; Receipt: 468480 Date: 04/12/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL ; INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING; (AS OF 04/13/2021 CREDIT HISTORY REPORT HAS NOT BEEN FILED WITH CLERK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketHUSBAND'S PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION ; OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF; Receipt: 468480 Date: 04/12/2021; Amount: $408.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREAGOR ESQ, ITASCA M