Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 04/14/2021 at 16:08:17 (UTC).

RE: MARRIAGE OF: FULLER, THOMAS G AND FULLER, TAMARA G

Case Summary

On 03/17/2021 RE MARRIAGE OF FULLER, THOMAS G AND FULLER, TAMARA G was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0744

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

FULLER, THOMAS G

Gainesville, FL 32608

FULLER, TAMARA G

High Springs, FL 32643

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

TOMSHINSKY ESQ., SABINA

126 Nw 76 Dr Ste B

Gainesville, FL 32607

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • DispositionDISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 03/17/2021; Disposition: NJ01 - NON-JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketACTIVITY TRANSFERRED TO DEPOSITORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketHEARING DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FINAL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 467530; Paid: $408.00; Applied: $408.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $408.00; Total Fee Paid: $408.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; THOMAS G FULLER (HUSBAND);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; THOMAS G FULLER (HUSBAND);

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; TAMARA G FULLER (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketWIFE'S CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE; TAMARA G FULLER (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER (DUPLICATE); TAMARA G FULLER (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; TAMARA G FULLER (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY COURT ORDER; TAMARA G FULLER (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; TAMARA G FULLER (WIFE); Receipt: 467530 Date: 03/19/2021; Amount: $408.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TOMSHINSKY ESQ., SABINA