Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/13/2020 at 17:10:32 (UTC).

RE: MARRIAGE OF: ELLSWORTH, ROGER F AND ASAALA, ROSELYNE

Case Summary

On 12/12/2018 RE MARRIAGE OF ELLSWORTH, ROGER F AND ASAALA, ROSELYNE was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4114

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

ELLSWORTH, ROGER F

Gainesville, FL 32609

ASAALA, ROSELYNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

MARRAFFINO ESQ, LAWRENCE J

3312 W University Ave, Ste 2

Gainesville, FL 32607

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2018
  • DispositionDISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 12/12/2018; Disposition: DJ01 - JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketALERT CANCELLED; INDIGENT canceled on: 12/21/2018 ; For: ASAALA, ROSELYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE OF; ROSELYNE ASAALA (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketHEARING DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $408.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $408.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketANSWER, WAIVER AND REQUEST FOR COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketANSWER, WAIVER AND REQUEST FOR COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketALERT ISSUED; INDIGENT issued on: 12/12/2018 ; For: ASAALA, ROSELYNE ; Bond Amt: ; Bond Type:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS - DUPLICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT; ROSELYNE ASAALA (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Amount: $408.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARRAFFINO ESQ, LAWRENCE J