This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 08/18/2021 at 07:08:57 (UTC).

RE: MARRIAGE OF: DALLY, LESLIE M AND DALLY, KIMBERLY B

Case Summary

On 01/08/2021 RE MARRIAGE OF DALLY, LESLIE M AND DALLY, KIMBERLY B was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0065

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

DALLY, KIMBERLY B

Mansfield, PA 16933

DALLY, LESLIE M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

TOMSHINSKY ESQ., SABINA

126 Nw 76 Dr Ste B

Gainesville, FL 32607

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2021
  • DispositionDISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 01/08/2021; Disposition: DE03 - DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketORDER SETTING DATE FOR FINAL HEARING - MAY 19, 2021 @ 3:30 P.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ENTERED 4/2/2021 AS TO KIMBERLY B DALLY (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION - NOTICE OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; NOTICE OF ACTION - ISSUED, PETITIONER/HUSBAND'S PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF, CIVIL COVER SHEET, FAMILY COVER SHEET, STANDING FAMILY COURT ORDER, AFFIDAVIT OF COROBORATING WITNESSES, NOTICE OF DESIGNATING EMAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION, NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER, REQUEST FORM FOR NUMBER(S) REDACTION, NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING, SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO KIMBERLY B DALLY ; ; Circuit -Certificate of Mailing Document; Sent on: 02/19/2021 16:05:40.78

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCOVER LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION - ISSUED; KIMBERLY B DALLY (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE; KIMBERLY B DALLY (WIFE); Receipt: 464591 Date: 01/11/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FORM FOR NUMBER(S) REDACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATING E-MAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.516(B)(1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketPETITIONER/HUSBAND'S PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF Receipt: 464591 Date: 01/11/2021; Amount: $408.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TOMSHINSKY ESQ., SABINA