Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/04/2020 at 02:26:20 (UTC).

RE: MARRIAGE OF: CADIZ JR, ROBERT L AND CADIZ, JULIE R

Case Summary

On 06/20/2017 RE MARRIAGE OF CADIZ JR, ROBERT L AND CADIZ, JULIE R was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KREIDER, DAVID P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2165

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KREIDER, DAVID P

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

CADIZ, JULIE R

Gainesville, FL 32608

CADIZ JR, ROBERT L

California, MD 20619

MARTIN, JULIE RENEE

Gainesville, FL 32608

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2017
  • DispositionDISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 06/20/2017; Disposition: NJ01 - NON-JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • HearingPRO SE HEARINGS; Judge: KREIDER, DAVID P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • HearingPRO SE HEARINGS; Judge: KREIDER, DAVID P; Result: CANCELED PER ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: PRO SE HEARINGS ; Date: 10/13/2017 Time: 9:00 am ; Judge: HULSLANDER - DIV DR4, VICTOR L Location: COURTROOM 3-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketORDER RESCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE AND/OR NON-JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: PRO SE HEARINGS ; Date: 09/11/2017 Time: 9:00 am ; Judge: HULSLANDER - DIV DR4, VICTOR L Location:; ; Result: CANCELED PER ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketANSWER AND WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE; JULIE R CADIZ (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; JULIE R CADIZ (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF CHILDREN BORN / NOT BORN DURING THE MARRIAGE; JULIE R CADIZ (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED; JULIE R CADIZ (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES; JULIE R CADIZ (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; JULIE R CADIZ (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY COURT ORDER; JULIE R CADIZ (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET; JULIE R CADIZ (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FEE 28.241(1)(d) CIRCUIT CIVIL Receipt: 403582 Date: 06/20/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE Receipt: 403582 Date: 06/20/2017; Amount: $408.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less