Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 04/14/2021 at 16:07:49 (UTC).

RE: MARRIAGE OF: BROWN, GERALD D AND HEALEY, NATASHUA L

Case Summary

On 03/17/2021 RE MARRIAGE OF BROWN, GERALD D AND HEALEY, NATASHUA L was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0730

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

HEALEY, NATASHUA L

Gainesville, FL 32609

BROWN, GERALD D

Gainesville, FL 32609

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED 3/18/2021; NATASHUA L HEALEY (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED 3/18/2021; NATASHUA L HEALEY (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $418.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $418.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketALERT ISSUED; INDIGENT issued on: 03/17/2021 ; For: BROWN, GERALD D ; Bond Amt: ; Bond Type:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS-ISSUED AS TO NATASHUA L HEALEY; (RTN TO HUSBAND- 03/17/2021-SRW)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS FEE 28.241(1)(d) CIRCUIT CIVIL; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE OF; GERALD D BROWN (HUSBAND);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT OF HUSBAND; GERALD D BROWN (HUSBAND);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF CHILDREN BORN / NOT BORN DURING THE MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED; GERALD D BROWN (HUSBAND);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; GERALD D BROWN (HUSBAND);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY COURT ORDER; GERALD D BROWN (HUSBAND);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET; GERALD D BROWN (HUSBAND);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; GERALD D BROWN (HUSBAND);; Amount: $408.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS / CLERK'S DETERMINATION (INDIGENT); GERALD D BROWN (HUSBAND);

    Read MoreRead Less