Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 04/19/2021 at 16:00:53 (UTC).

RE: MARRIAGE OF: BOLINAO, JOSEPH CHRISTEN AND BOLINAO, NATALIE KATHLEEN

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 RE MARRIAGE OF BOLINAO, JOSEPH CHRISTEN AND BOLINAO, NATALIE KATHLEEN was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GROEB, ROBERT K. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0787

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GROEB, ROBERT K

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

BOLINAO, JOSEPH CHRISTEN

Gainesville, FL 32653

BOLINAO, NATALIE KATHLEEN

Gainesville, FL 32609

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2021
  • HearingPRO SE HEARINGS; Judge: GROEB, ROBERT K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: PRO SE HEARINGS ; Date: 05/19/2021 Time: 3:00 pm ; Judge: GROEB, ROBERT K Location: COURTROOM 3-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketORDER SCHEDULING HEARING BY VIDEO CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $408.00; Total Fee Paid: $408.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 467653; Paid: $408.00; Applied: $408.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; JOSEPH CHRISTEN BOLINAO (HUSBAND);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT OF HUSBAND; JOSEPH CHRISTEN BOLINAO (HUSBAND);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND WAIVER; JOSEPH CHRISTEN BOLINAO (HUSBAND);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY COURT ORDER; NATALIE KATHLEEN BOLINAO (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; NATALIE KATHLEEN BOLINAO (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketPARENTING PLAN; JOSEPH CHRISTEN BOLINAO (HUSBAND); NATALIE KATHLEEN BOLINAO (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ACT AFFIDAVIT; NATALIE KATHLEEN BOLINAO (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF CHILDREN BORN / NOT BORN DURING THE MARRIAGE; NATALIE KATHLEEN BOLINAO (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; NATALIE KATHLEEN BOLINAO (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; NATALIE KATHLEEN BOLINAO (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketPERMISSION TO USE E-MAIL; NATALIE KATHLEEN BOLINAO (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketFAMILY LAW SELF HELP PROGRAM DISCLOSURE/ASSIST IN COMPLETING FORMS; NATALIE KATHLEEN BOLINAO (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES; NATALIE KATHLEEN BOLINAO (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET; NATALIE KATHLEEN BOLINAO (WIFE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE Receipt: 467653 Date: 03/22/2021; NATALIE KATHLEEN BOLINAO (WIFE);; Amount: $408.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less