This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 09/03/2021 at 15:17:31 (UTC).

RATH/HARPER & ASSOCIATES INC -vs- TOLBERT, ALISA

Case Summary

On 08/20/2021 RATH/HARPER ASSOCIATES INC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against TOLBERT, ALISA. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2870

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RATH/HARPER & ASSOCIATES INC

RH MANAGEMENT AS AGENT FOR THE OWNER

Defendant

TOLBERT, ALISA

Gainesville, FL 32608

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAYTER ESQ, JOHN F

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Attorney At Law, 1418 Nw 6 St

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS ; SUBSTITUTE SERVED 8/25/2021 AS TO ALISA TOBERT

08/26/2021: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS ; SUBSTITUTE SERVED 8/25/2021 AS TO ALISA TOBERT

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (CLOSES)

08/26/2021: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (CLOSES)

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

08/24/2021: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE Receipt: 474058 Date: 08/23/2021; ALISA TOLBERT (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

08/20/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE Receipt: 474058 Date: 08/23/2021; ALISA TOLBERT (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND/OR COSTS (REOPEN)

08/20/2021: MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND/OR COSTS (REOPEN)

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

08/20/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION WITH MONEY DAMAGES $2,500 OR LESS Receipt: 474058 Date: 08/23/2021; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

08/20/2021: COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION WITH MONEY DAMAGES $2,500 OR LESS Receipt: 474058 Date: 08/23/2021; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS ; SUBSTITUTE SERVED 8/25/2021 AS TO ALISA TOBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DispositionEVICTION RESIDENTIAL POSSESSION ONLY OR WITH DAMAGES UP TO $2500.00; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 08/20/2021; Disposition: BH01- BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 474058; Paid: $195.00; Applied: $195.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $195.00; Total Fee Paid: $195.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE Receipt: 474058 Date: 08/23/2021; ALISA TOLBERT (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND/OR COSTS (REOPEN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION WITH MONEY DAMAGES $2,500 OR LESS Receipt: 474058 Date: 08/23/2021; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RH MANAGEMENT AS AGENT FOR THE OWNER is a litigant

Latest cases where RATH/HARPER AND ASSOCIATES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAYTER ESQ, JOHN F