This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/06/2023 at 10:15:45 (UTC).

RATH/HARPER AND ASSOCIATES INC -vs- HART, CHRISTOPHER et al

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 RATH/HARPER AND ASSOCIATES INC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against HART, CHRISTOPHER. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0135

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RATH/HARPER AND ASSOCIATES INC

RH MANAGEMENT AS AGENT FOR THE OWNER

Defendants

HART, CHRISTOPHER

FRASER, GABRIELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HAYTER ESQ, JOHN F

WILLIAMSON ESQ, DAVID E

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND DAMAGES Receipt: 495743 Date: 01/12/2023; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

01/11/2023: COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND DAMAGES Receipt: 495743 Date: 01/12/2023; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

01/11/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

SUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE; CHRISTOPHER HART (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 495743 Date: 01/12/2023; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

01/11/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE; CHRISTOPHER HART (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 495743 Date: 01/12/2023; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

SUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE; GABRIELLE FRASER (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 495743 Date: 01/12/2023; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

01/11/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE; GABRIELLE FRASER (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 495743 Date: 01/12/2023; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

MOTION TO TAX ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS (REOPEN)

01/11/2023: MOTION TO TAX ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS (REOPEN)

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; CHRISTOPHER HART (DEFENDANT);

01/17/2023: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; CHRISTOPHER HART (DEFENDANT);

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; GABRIELLE FRASER (DEFENDANT);

01/17/2023: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; GABRIELLE FRASER (DEFENDANT);

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5-DAY SUMMONS POSTED 1/18/2023; CHRISTOPHER HART (DEFENDANT);

01/19/2023: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5-DAY SUMMONS POSTED 1/18/2023; CHRISTOPHER HART (DEFENDANT);

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5-DAY SUMMONS POSTED 1/18/2023; GABRIELLE FRASER (DEFENDANT);

01/19/2023: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5-DAY SUMMONS POSTED 1/18/2023; GABRIELLE FRASER (DEFENDANT);

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT AS TO POSSESSION - ISSUED (1/30/2023-KBH); CHRISTOPHER HART (DEFENDANT); GABRIELLE FRASER (DEFENDANT);

01/26/2023: MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT AS TO POSSESSION - ISSUED (1/30/2023-KBH); CHRISTOPHER HART (DEFENDANT); GABRIELLE FRASER (DEFENDANT);

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

01/26/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION (REOPEN)

01/26/2023: MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION (REOPEN)

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION (CLOSES)

01/30/2023: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION (CLOSES)

WRIT OF POSSESSION - ISSUED 2/2/2023; CHRISTOPHER HART (DEFENDANT); GABRIELLE FRASER (DEFENDANT);

02/02/2023: WRIT OF POSSESSION - ISSUED 2/2/2023; CHRISTOPHER HART (DEFENDANT); GABRIELLE FRASER (DEFENDANT);

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION - ISSUED 2/2/2023; CHRISTOPHER HART (DEFENDANT); GABRIELLE FRASER (DEFENDANT);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DispositionEVICTION RESIDENTIAL POSSESSION ONLY OR WITH DAMAGES UP TO $2500.00; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 01/12/2023; Disposition: DE03 - DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION (CLOSES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION (REOPEN)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT AS TO POSSESSION - ISSUED (1/30/2023-KBH); CHRISTOPHER HART (DEFENDANT); GABRIELLE FRASER (DEFENDANT);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5-DAY SUMMONS POSTED 1/18/2023; GABRIELLE FRASER (DEFENDANT);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5-DAY SUMMONS POSTED 1/18/2023; CHRISTOPHER HART (DEFENDANT);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; GABRIELLE FRASER (DEFENDANT);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; CHRISTOPHER HART (DEFENDANT);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $205.00; Total Fee Paid: $205.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • FinancialReceipt #: 495743; Paid: 495743; Applied: $205.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO TAX ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS (REOPEN)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE; GABRIELLE FRASER (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 495743 Date: 01/12/2023; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE; CHRISTOPHER HART (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 495743 Date: 01/12/2023; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND DAMAGES Receipt: 495743 Date: 01/12/2023; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less