Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 04/14/2021 at 16:09:34 (UTC).

POWELL CHIROPRACTIC INC -VS- PROGRESSIVE AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/17/2021 POWELL CHIROPRACTIC INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0950

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POWELL CHIROPRACTIC INC

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DALY ESQ, JOHN C

8551 W Sunrise Blvd Suite 304

Plantation, FL 33322

 

Court Documents

CERTIFIED COPY OF PROGRESS DOCKET

03/15/2021: CERTIFIED COPY OF PROGRESS DOCKET

TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - ORDER

02/23/2021: TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - ORDER

TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

10/12/2020: TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - SHOW CAUSE ORDER- FORUM NON CONVIENS

09/22/2020: TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - SHOW CAUSE ORDER- FORUM NON CONVIENS

TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND MOTION FOR LATE REPLY

08/06/2020: TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND MOTION FOR LATE REPLY

TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

07/16/2020: TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIMATIVE DEFENSES

06/30/2020: TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIMATIVE DEFENSES

TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

06/19/2020: TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - MEMORANDUM REGARDING DISCOVERY REQUESTS FOR MATERIALS AND PRIVILEGED INFORMATION LOG

06/19/2020: TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - MEMORANDUM REGARDING DISCOVERY REQUESTS FOR MATERIALS AND PRIVILEGED INFORMATION LOG

TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES PROPOUNDED BY PLAINTIFF

06/19/2020: TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES PROPOUNDED BY PLAINTIFF

TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - DEFENDANT'S OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OF FLORIDA ADMINSITRATIVE CODE 69B-220.201 PURSUANT TO FLORIDA EVIDENCE CODE 90.201, 90.202 AND 90.203

06/16/2020: TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - DEFENDANT'S OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OF FLORIDA ADMINSITRATIVE CODE 69B-220.201 PURSUANT TO FLORIDA EVIDENCE CODE 90.201, 90.202 AND 90.203

TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/21/2020: TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

05/21/2020: TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING REQUEST OF DEPOSITIONS OF ADJUSTERS

05/21/2020: TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING REQUEST OF DEPOSITIONS OF ADJUSTERS

TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-AMIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

05/05/2020: TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-AMIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - DEFENDANT'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

05/05/2020: TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - DEFENDANT'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - COMPLAINT

02/06/2020: TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - COMPLAINT

TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - SUMMONS

02/06/2020: TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - SUMMONS

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $55.00; Total Fee Paid: $55.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 467446; Paid: $55.00; Applied: $55.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketFILING FEE FOR STATEMENT OF CLAIM (< $100) Receipt: 467446 Date: 03/17/2021; Amount: $55.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF PROGRESS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER TRANSFERRING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - SHOW CAUSE ORDER- FORUM NON CONVIENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND MOTION FOR LATE REPLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO AMEND PLEADINGS VIA INTERLINEATION

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING REQUEST OF DEPOSITIONS OF ADJUSTERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING ADJUSTERS CODE OF ETHICS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-AMIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - DEFENDANT'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT - CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Powell Chiropractic, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daly, John C, Jr.