Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/13/2020 at 22:16:06 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC -vs- WALSH, STEVEN D

Case Summary

On 12/31/2018 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WALSH, STEVEN D. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4868

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

WALSH, STEVEN D

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITE ESQ, RACQUEL A

120 Corporate Blvd

Norfolk, VA 23502

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

01/08/2019: ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

12/31/2018: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: STEVEN D WALSH; Receipt: 430802 Date: 12/31/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

12/31/2018: 20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: STEVEN D WALSH; Receipt: 430802 Date: 12/31/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE- SERVED 1/26/2019

01/29/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE- SERVED 1/26/2019

STIPULATION FOR PAYMENT; (ORDER TO BE FILED TO CASE CLOSE)

03/11/2019: STIPULATION FOR PAYMENT; (ORDER TO BE FILED TO CASE CLOSE)

COMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS ; Receipt: 430802 Date: 12/31/2018; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

12/31/2018: COMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS ; Receipt: 430802 Date: 12/31/2018; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL OF LAWSUIT (CLOSED)

03/20/2019: ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL OF LAWSUIT (CLOSED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2019
  • DispositionCONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS $5,000.01 TO $15,000.00; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 12/31/2018; Disposition: BH01- BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPROVING STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL OF LAWSUIT (CLOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR PAYMENT; (ORDER TO BE FILED TO CASE CLOSE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE- SERVED 1/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $310.00; Total Fee Paid: $310.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 430802; Paid: $310.00; Applied: $310.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: STEVEN D WALSH; Receipt: 430802 Date: 12/31/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS ; Receipt: 430802 Date: 12/31/2018; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less