Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/05/2020 at 01:30:11 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC -VS- TILESTON, KAREN L

Case Summary

On 08/11/2017 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TILESTON, KAREN L. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RAWLS, MESHON T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2570

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RAWLS, MESHON T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

TILESTON, KAREN L

Gainesville, FL 32607

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WHITE ESQ, RACQUEL A

120 Corporate Blvd

Norfolk, VA 23502

HOPE ESQ, ERIC

204 West University Ave Ste 6

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

JUDGES NOTES FILED

01/31/2018: JUDGES NOTES FILED

ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL OF LAWSUIT

10/24/2017: ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL OF LAWSUIT

STIPULATION FOR PAYMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL

10/23/2017: STIPULATION FOR PAYMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL

ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE OR DISMISS AND ORDER SETTING CASE FOR CONTINUED PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE- FRIDAY, JANUARY 26, 2018 @ 9:30 A.M.

10/18/2017: ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE OR DISMISS AND ORDER SETTING CASE FOR CONTINUED PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE- FRIDAY, JANUARY 26, 2018 @ 9:30 A.M.

PRETRIAL RESULTS -PLAINTIFF PRESENT/DEFENDANT(S) NO SHOW/ CONT. FOR SERVICE ON LOS DOCKET- 1/26/2018 @ 9:30 A.M.

09/29/2017: PRETRIAL RESULTS -PLAINTIFF PRESENT/DEFENDANT(S) NO SHOW/ CONT. FOR SERVICE ON LOS DOCKET- 1/26/2018 @ 9:30 A.M.

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

09/28/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

08/25/2017: ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 406152 Date: 08/11/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

08/11/2017: (ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 406152 Date: 08/11/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

08/11/2017: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

BILL OF SALE

08/11/2017: BILL OF SALE

AFFIDAVIT

08/11/2017: AFFIDAVIT

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

08/11/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($500.01 - $2500.00) Receipt: 406152 Date: 08/11/2017; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

08/11/2017: STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($500.01 - $2500.00) Receipt: 406152 Date: 08/11/2017; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGES NOTES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • HearingPRETRIAL/LACK OF SERVICE; Judge: RAWLS, MESHON T; Result: STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DispositionCONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS $500.01 TO $2500.00; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 08/11/2017; Disposition: DJ01 - JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPROVING STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL OF LAWSUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR PAYMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF LACK OF SERVICE HRG (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: PRETRIAL/LACK OF SERVICE ; Date: 01/26/2018 Time: 9:30 am ; Judge: VAN VORST - DIV IV, KRISTINE Location: COURTROOM 2-A; ; Result: STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE OR DISMISS AND ORDER SETTING CASE FOR CONTINUED PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE- FRIDAY, JANUARY 26, 2018 @ 9:30 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • HearingSMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE; Judge: RAWLS, MESHON T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL RESULTS -PLAINTIFF PRESENT/DEFENDANT(S) NO SHOW/ CONT. FOR SERVICE ON LOS DOCKET- 1/26/2018 @ 9:30 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $185.00; Total Fee Paid: $185.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • FinancialReceipt # 406152; Paid: $185.00; Applied: $185.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 09/29/2017 Time: 9:00 am ; Judge: TBD- DIV IV, TBD Location: COURTROOM 2-A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 406152 Date: 08/11/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM ($500.01 - $2500.00) Receipt: 406152 Date: 08/11/2017; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOPE ESQ, ERIC

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHITE, RACQUEL ANN