Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/13/2020 at 22:43:00 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC -vs- STOWE, SHARON K

Case Summary

On 12/31/2018 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STOWE, SHARON K. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4872

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

STOWE, SHARON K

Micanopy, FL 32667

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITE ESQ, RACQUEL A

120 Corporate Blvd

Norfolk, VA 23502

 

Court Documents

(E-REDACTED) COMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS ; Receipt: 430814 Date: 12/31/2018; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

12/31/2018: (E-REDACTED) COMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS ; Receipt: 430814 Date: 12/31/2018; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE; SHARON K STOWE (DEFENDANT);

09/05/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE; SHARON K STOWE (DEFENDANT);

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND ENTRY OF DEFAULT- ENTERED 09/05/2019 AS TO: SHARON K STOWE (DEFENDANT);

09/05/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND ENTRY OF DEFAULT- ENTERED 09/05/2019 AS TO: SHARON K STOWE (DEFENDANT);

20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: SHARON K STOWE; Receipt: 430814 Date: 12/31/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

12/31/2018: 20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: SHARON K STOWE; Receipt: 430814 Date: 12/31/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (CLOSES)

12/13/2019: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (CLOSES)

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE- SUBSTITUTE SERVED 1/23/2019; SHARON K STOWE (DEFENDANT);

01/23/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE- SUBSTITUTE SERVED 1/23/2019; SHARON K STOWE (DEFENDANT);

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

12/31/2018: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

ORDER TO ADVISE OF STATUS AND ; SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; 1/17/2020 @ 1:30 PM

12/12/2019: ORDER TO ADVISE OF STATUS AND ; SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; 1/17/2020 @ 1:30 PM

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

01/08/2019: ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2019
  • DispositionCONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS $5,000.01 TO $15,000.00; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 12/31/2018; Disposition: BH01- BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO ADVISE OF STATUS AND ; SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; 1/17/2020 @ 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT AND ENTRY OF DEFAULT- ENTERED 09/05/2019 AS TO: SHARON K STOWE (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE; SHARON K STOWE (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE- SUBSTITUTE SERVED 1/23/2019; SHARON K STOWE (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $310.00; Total Fee Paid: $310.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 430814; Paid: $310.00; Applied: $310.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: SHARON K STOWE; Receipt: 430814 Date: 12/31/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(E-REDACTED) COMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS ; Receipt: 430814 Date: 12/31/2018; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less