Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 05/10/2021 at 16:08:44 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC -VS- POULETTE, RUSTY

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against POULETTE, RUSTY. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RAWLS, MESHON T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1269

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RAWLS, MESHON T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

120 Corporate Blvd

Norfolk, VA 23502

Defendant

POULETTE, RUSTY

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITE ESQ, RACQUEL A

120 Corporate Blvd

Norfolk, VA 23502

 

Court Documents

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (CLOSES)

04/21/2021: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (CLOSES)

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

04/20/2021: ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 468564 Date: 04/14/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

04/12/2021: (ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 468564 Date: 04/14/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

(E-REDACTED) STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) Receipt: 468564 Date: 04/14/2021; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

04/12/2021: (E-REDACTED) STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) Receipt: 468564 Date: 04/14/2021; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

04/12/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

04/12/2021: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

04/12/2021: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • HearingSMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE; Judge: RAWLS, MESHON T; Result: closing papers filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DispositionSMALL CLAIM $501 TO $2500; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 04/12/2021; Disposition: BH01- BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 468564; Paid: $185.00; Applied: $185.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 05/21/2021 Time: 9:30 am ; Judge: RAWLS - DIV IV, MESHON T Location: COURTROOM 2-B; ; Result: closing papers filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $185.00; Total Fee Paid: $185.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 468564 Date: 04/14/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(E-REDACTED) STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) Receipt: 468564 Date: 04/14/2021; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHITE, RACQUEL ANN