This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/06/2022 at 07:55:52 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC -VS- PETERS, KATHRYN M

Case Summary

On 12/08/2021 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PETERS, KATHRYN M. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RAWLS, MESHON T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4252

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RAWLS, MESHON T

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK / BANANA REPUBLIC

Defendant

PETERS, KATHRYN M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STAFFORD ESQ, CIARA HENDERSON

KILBURN ESQ, PATRICK J

WHITE ESQ, RACQUEL A

HERRERA ESQ, DAVID

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) Receipt: 478550 Date: 12/10/2021; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

12/08/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) Receipt: 478550 Date: 12/10/2021; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

12/08/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 478550 Date: 12/10/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

12/08/2021: (ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 478550 Date: 12/10/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

12/08/2021: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

12/17/2021: ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED 1/5/2022

01/05/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED 1/5/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2022
  • HearingSMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE; Judge: RAWLS, MESHON T

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED 1/5/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 02/11/2022 Time: 9:30 am ; Judge: RAWLS - DIV IV, MESHON T Location: COURTROOM 2-B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 478550; Paid: $185.00; Applied: $185.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $185.00; Total Fee Paid: $185.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 478550 Date: 12/10/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) Receipt: 478550 Date: 12/10/2021; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less