This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/03/2022 at 18:53:16 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC -VS- OLES, STANLEY

Case Summary

On 05/19/2021 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against OLES, STANLEY. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is VAN VORST, KRISTINE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1683

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Judge Details

Judge

VAN VORST, KRISTINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

OLES, STANLEY

Gainesville, FL 32605

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITE ESQ, RACQUEL A

120 Corporate Blvd

Norfolk, VA 23502

 

Court Documents

(E-REDACTED) STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) ; Receipt: 470108 Date: 05/24/2021; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

05/19/2021: (E-REDACTED) STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) ; Receipt: 470108 Date: 05/24/2021; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

05/19/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL ; INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

05/19/2021: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL ; INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL; Receipt: 470108 Date: 05/24/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

05/19/2021: (ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL; Receipt: 470108 Date: 05/24/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

05/19/2021: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

05/26/2021: ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED 6/04/2021; STANLEY OLES (DEFENDANT);

06/15/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED 6/04/2021; STANLEY OLES (DEFENDANT);

PRETRIAL RESULTS - ALL PARTIES PRESENT. CONT FOR STIPULATION/SETTLEMENT- FRIDAY, SEPTEMBER 17, 2021 AT 9:30 .M.

07/16/2021: PRETRIAL RESULTS - ALL PARTIES PRESENT. CONT FOR STIPULATION/SETTLEMENT- FRIDAY, SEPTEMBER 17, 2021 AT 9:30 .M.

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE / RAEMI EAGLE-GLENN FOR COURT PURPOSES

07/16/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE / RAEMI EAGLE-GLENN FOR COURT PURPOSES

PRETRIAL SET FOR - (ISSUED) ALIAS SUMMONS; MAILED TO PL'S ATTY/ DEFENDANT 07/2021-MJP)

07/20/2021: PRETRIAL SET FOR - (ISSUED) ALIAS SUMMONS; MAILED TO PL'S ATTY/ DEFENDANT 07/2021-MJP)

PRETRIAL RESULTS - NO PARTIES PRESENT. ORDER OF DISMISSAL ***JA TO PREPARE ORDER***

09/17/2021: PRETRIAL RESULTS - NO PARTIES PRESENT. ORDER OF DISMISSAL ***JA TO PREPARE ORDER***

ORDER OF DISMISSAL (SC) (CLOSES)

09/30/2021: ORDER OF DISMISSAL (SC) (CLOSES)

MAIL RETURNED; STANLEY OLES

10/18/2021: MAIL RETURNED; STANLEY OLES

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED; STANLEY OLES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DispositionSMALL CLAIM $501 TO $2500; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 05/19/2021; Disposition: HH01 - AFTER HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL (SC) (CLOSES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • HearingSMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE; Judge: VAN VORST, KRISTINE; Result: DISMISSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL RESULTS - NO PARTIES PRESENT. ORDER OF DISMISSAL ***JA TO PREPARE ORDER***

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SET FOR - (ISSUED) ALIAS SUMMONS; MAILED TO PL'S ATTY/ DEFENDANT 07/2021-MJP)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • HearingSMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE; Judge: VAN VORST, KRISTINE; Result: HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE / RAEMI EAGLE-GLENN FOR COURT PURPOSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 09/17/2021 Time: 9:30 am ; Judge: VAN VORST - DIV V, KRISTINE Location: COURTROOM 2-B; ; Result:; ; Result: DISMISSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED 6/04/2021; STANLEY OLES (DEFENDANT);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 470108; Paid: $185.00; Applied: $185.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 07/16/2021 Time: 9:30 am ; Judge: VAN VORST - DIV V, KRISTINE Location: COURTROOM 2-B; ; Result: HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $185.00; Total Fee Paid: $185.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL; Receipt: 470108 Date: 05/24/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL ; INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(E-REDACTED) STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) ; Receipt: 470108 Date: 05/24/2021; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHITE, RACQUEL ANN