This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/03/2022 at 22:54:33 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC -VS- HARRIS, LAURA

Case Summary

On 06/02/2021 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HARRIS, LAURA. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is VAN VORST, KRISTINE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1872

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Judge Details

Judge

VAN VORST, KRISTINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

HARRIS, LAURA

Gainesville, FL 32608

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITE ESQ, RACQUEL A

120 Corporate Blvd

Norfolk, VA 23502

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

06/01/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

06/01/2021: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

06/01/2021: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 470555 Date: 06/03/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

06/02/2021: (ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 470555 Date: 06/03/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

(E-REDACTED) STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) ; Receipt: 470555 Date: 06/03/2021; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

06/01/2021: (E-REDACTED) STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) ; Receipt: 470555 Date: 06/03/2021; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

06/07/2021: ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED PERSONAL 6/17/2021; LAURA HARRIS (DEFENDANT);

06/18/2021: SHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED PERSONAL 6/17/2021; LAURA HARRIS (DEFENDANT);

PRETRIAL RESULTS - ALL PARTIES PRESENT. CON FOR STIPULATION/SETTLEMENT FRIDAY, OCTOBER 1, 2021 AT 9:30 A.M.

07/30/2021: PRETRIAL RESULTS - ALL PARTIES PRESENT. CON FOR STIPULATION/SETTLEMENT FRIDAY, OCTOBER 1, 2021 AT 9:30 A.M.

PRETRIAL SET FOR - (ISSUED) ALIAS SUMMONS; MAILED TO PL'S ATTY/DEFENDANT 8/03/2021-MJP

08/03/2021: PRETRIAL SET FOR - (ISSUED) ALIAS SUMMONS; MAILED TO PL'S ATTY/DEFENDANT 8/03/2021-MJP

PRETRIAL RESULTS - NO PARTIES PRESENT. ORDER OF DISMISSAL ***JA TO PREPARE ORDER***

10/01/2021: PRETRIAL RESULTS - NO PARTIES PRESENT. ORDER OF DISMISSAL ***JA TO PREPARE ORDER***

ORDER OF DISMISSAL (SC) (CLOSES)

10/12/2021: ORDER OF DISMISSAL (SC) (CLOSES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • DispositionSMALL CLAIM $501 TO $2500; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 06/02/2021; Disposition: HH01 - AFTER HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL (SC) (CLOSES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • HearingSMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE; Judge: VAN VORST, KRISTINE; Result: HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL RESULTS - NO PARTIES PRESENT. ORDER OF DISMISSAL ***JA TO PREPARE ORDER***

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SET FOR - (ISSUED) ALIAS SUMMONS; MAILED TO PL'S ATTY/DEFENDANT 8/03/2021-MJP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 10/01/2021 Time: 9:30 am ; Judge: VAN VORST - DIV V, KRISTINE Location: COURTROOM 2-B; ; Result: DISMISSED; ; Result: HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • HearingSMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE; Judge: VAN VORST, KRISTINE; Result: CONTINUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL RESULTS - ALL PARTIES PRESENT. CON FOR STIPULATION/SETTLEMENT FRIDAY, OCTOBER 1, 2021 AT 9:30 A.M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED PERSONAL 6/17/2021; LAURA HARRIS (DEFENDANT);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 470555; Paid: $185.00; Applied: $185.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 07/30/2021 Time: 9:30 am ; Judge: VAN VORST - DIV V, KRISTINE Location: COURTROOM 2-B; ; Result: CONTINUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $185.00; Total Fee Paid: $185.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 470555 Date: 06/03/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(E-REDACTED) STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) ; Receipt: 470555 Date: 06/03/2021; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHITE, RACQUEL ANN