This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/03/2022 at 21:10:11 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC -VS- DIAZ, ANESSA

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DIAZ, ANESSA. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is VAN VORST, KRISTINE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1775

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Judge Details

Judge

VAN VORST, KRISTINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

DIAZ, ANESSA

Gainesville, FL 32607

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITE ESQ, RACQUEL A

120 Corporate Blvd

Norfolk, VA 23502

Defendant Attorney

HICKS ESQ, DAVID C

3639 Cortez Rd West Ste 130

Bradenton, FL 34210

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (CLOSES)

09/02/2021: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (CLOSES)

NOTICE SETTING REMOTE HEARING ; SEPTEMBER 17, 2021 @ 1:30PM

07/29/2021: NOTICE SETTING REMOTE HEARING ; SEPTEMBER 17, 2021 @ 1:30PM

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE / RAEMI EAGLE-GLENN FOR COURT PURPOSES

07/16/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE / RAEMI EAGLE-GLENN FOR COURT PURPOSES

PRETRIAL RESULTS - ALL PARTIES PRESENT. CMC SEPTEMBER 17, 2021 AT 1:30 P.M.

07/16/2021: PRETRIAL RESULTS - ALL PARTIES PRESENT. CMC SEPTEMBER 17, 2021 AT 1:30 P.M.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

07/08/2021: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; DAVID C HICKS ESQ (Attorney) on behalf of ANESSA DIAZ (DEFENDANT)

07/07/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; DAVID C HICKS ESQ (Attorney) on behalf of ANESSA DIAZ (DEFENDANT)

SHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED SUBSTITUTE 5/29/2021; ANESSA DIAZ (DEFENDANT);

06/01/2021: SHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED SUBSTITUTE 5/29/2021; ANESSA DIAZ (DEFENDANT);

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

05/28/2021: ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL ; INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

05/24/2021: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL ; INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

05/24/2021: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

ISSUED SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL; Receipt: 470268 Date: 05/26/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

05/24/2021: ISSUED SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL; Receipt: 470268 Date: 05/26/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

05/24/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

(E-REDACTED) STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) ; Receipt: 470268 Date: 05/26/2021; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

05/24/2021: (E-REDACTED) STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) ; Receipt: 470268 Date: 05/26/2021; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DispositionSMALL CLAIM $501 TO $2500; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 05/25/2021; Disposition: HH01 - AFTER HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (CLOSES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE SETTING REMOTE HEARING ; SEPTEMBER 17, 2021 @ 1:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • HearingSMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE; Judge: VAN VORST, KRISTINE; Result: HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE / RAEMI EAGLE-GLENN FOR COURT PURPOSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL RESULTS - ALL PARTIES PRESENT. CMC SEPTEMBER 17, 2021 AT 1:30 P.M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; DAVID C HICKS ESQ (Attorney) on behalf of ANESSA DIAZ (DEFENDANT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED SUBSTITUTE 5/29/2021; ANESSA DIAZ (DEFENDANT);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 470268; Paid: $185.00; Applied: $185.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 07/16/2021 Time: 9:30 am ; Judge: VAN VORST - DIV V, KRISTINE Location: COURTROOM 2-B; ; Result: HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $185.00; Total Fee Paid: $185.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL ; INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUED SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL; Receipt: 470268 Date: 05/26/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(E-REDACTED) STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) ; Receipt: 470268 Date: 05/26/2021; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HICKS, DAVID CANDLER