Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/11/2020 at 01:40:53 (UTC).

PIARD, WESLEY PHILIPPE -VS- PIARD, BARBARA L et al

Case Summary

On 07/26/2018 PIARD, WESLEY PHILIPPE filed a Family - Minor Custody lawsuit against PIARD, BARBARA L. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2416

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Minor Custody

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PIARD, WESLEY PHILIPPE

Gainesville, FL 32607

Respondents

HORNE, ALLAN R

Niceville, FL 32578

PIARD, BARBARA L

Gainesville, FL 32601

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • DocketREQUEST TO REDIRECT PAYMENTS TO NEW TITLE IV-D CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketSTATE DEPARTMENT CHANGED ADDRESS REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketREQUEST TO REDIRECT PAYMENTS TO NEW TITLE IV-D CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • DispositionTEMPORARY CHILD CUSTODY; Status: 99 CLOSED; Status Date: 10/23/2018; Disposition: 99CLOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketORDER GRANTING PETITION FOR TEMPORARY CUSTODY BY EXTENDED FAMILY CH. 751

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • DocketALERT ISSUED; INDIGENT issued on: 07/27/2018 ; For: PIARD, WESLEY PHILIPPE ; Bond Amt: ; Bond Type:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $407.00; Total Fee Paid: $7.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $400.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 423195; Paid: $7.00; Applied: $7.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS / CLERK'S DETERMINATION (INDIGENT); WESLEY PHILIPPE PIARD (PETITIONER);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketPETITION FOR TEMPORARY CUSTODY BY EXTENDED FAMILY; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketOATH, ATTEST FEE Receipt: 423195 Date: 07/26/2018; Amount: $7.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less