Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 02/06/2020 at 17:46:27 (UTC).

PERRY, MARVIN -VS- JAMES, LUCILLE

Case Summary

On 11/14/2017 PERRY, MARVIN filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JAMES, LUCILLE. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3805

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PERRY, MARVIN

Cumberland, MD 21502

Defendant

JAMES, LUCILLE

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORENO ESQ., JOSE I.

240 Nw 76 Dr Ste D

Gainesville, FL 32607

 

Court Documents

MAIL RETURNED ON 03/27/2018; LUCILLE JAMES (DEFENDANT);

03/27/2018: MAIL RETURNED ON 03/27/2018; LUCILLE JAMES (DEFENDANT);

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

03/05/2018: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

01/10/2018: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

NOTICE OF SUGGESTION OF MOOTNESS

01/10/2018: NOTICE OF SUGGESTION OF MOOTNESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND ESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

12/28/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND ESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

NOTICE OF HEARING -

11/30/2017: NOTICE OF HEARING -

MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS

11/21/2017: MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS

SHERIFF'S RETURN - SERVED; LUCILLE JAMES (DEFENDANT);

11/17/2017: SHERIFF'S RETURN - SERVED; LUCILLE JAMES (DEFENDANT);

AGREEMENT FOR DEFERRED PAYMENT OF COURT FEES AND PAYMENT SCHEDULE

11/15/2017: AGREEMENT FOR DEFERRED PAYMENT OF COURT FEES AND PAYMENT SCHEDULE

CIVIL COVER SHEET - DOES NOT STATE IF JURY TRIAL IS REQUESTED

11/15/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET - DOES NOT STATE IF JURY TRIAL IS REQUESTED

MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING; MARVIN PERRY (PLAINTIFF);

11/14/2017: MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING; MARVIN PERRY (PLAINTIFF);

SUMMONS-ISSUED AS TO LUCILLE JAMES; (RTN TO PL 11/15/17-SRW)

11/14/2017: SUMMONS-ISSUED AS TO LUCILLE JAMES; (RTN TO PL 11/15/17-SRW)

COMPLAINT FOR EJECTMENT FROM REAL ESTATE; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $400.00

11/14/2017: COMPLAINT FOR EJECTMENT FROM REAL ESTATE; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $400.00

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED ON 03/27/2018; LUCILLE JAMES (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DispositionOTHER REAL PROPERTY $50,001 - $249,999; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 11/14/2017; Disposition: B. HRG OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SUGGESTION OF MOOTNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND ESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN - SERVED; LUCILLE JAMES (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • FinancialReceipt # 410317; Paid: $40.00; Applied: $35.00; Refunded: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREEMENT FOR DEFERRED PAYMENT OF COURT FEES AND PAYMENT SCHEDULE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - DOES NOT STATE IF JURY TRIAL IS REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $435.00; Total Fee Paid: $35.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING; MARVIN PERRY (PLAINTIFF);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS-ISSUED AS TO LUCILLE JAMES; (RTN TO PL 11/15/17-SRW)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FEE 28.241(1)(d) CIRCUIT CIVIL Receipt: 410317 Date: 11/15/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketPAYMENT PLAN FEE CIRCUIT CIVIL (1 TIME FEE) Receipt: 410317 Date: 11/15/2017; Amount: $25.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EJECTMENT FROM REAL ESTATE; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORENO ESQ., JOSE I.