Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 05/10/2021 at 16:08:34 (UTC).

PEP-UF LLC -vs- SMITH, CRYSTAL D

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 PEP-UF LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against SMITH, CRYSTAL D. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1258

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEP-UF LLC

Defendant

SMITH, CRYSTAL D

Gainesville, FL 32607

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THRASHER III ESQ, ELWIN R

908 N Gadsden St

Tallahassee, FL 32303

 

Court Documents

MOTION REQUESTING MORE TIME IN THE FORM OF A LETTER FILED BY SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT (SRL); CRYSTAL D SMITH (DEFENDANT);

04/21/2021: MOTION REQUESTING MORE TIME IN THE FORM OF A LETTER FILED BY SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT (SRL); CRYSTAL D SMITH (DEFENDANT);

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS ; POSTED 4/19/2021 AS TO CRYSTAL D SMITH

04/20/2021: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS ; POSTED 4/19/2021 AS TO CRYSTAL D SMITH

MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT (SRL); CRYSTAL D SMITH (DEFENDANT);

04/20/2021: MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT (SRL); CRYSTAL D SMITH (DEFENDANT);

DECLARATION UNDER PENALTY OF PERJURY FORTHE CENTERES FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION'S TEMPORARY HALT IN EVICTIONS TO PREVENT FURTHER SPREAD OF COVID-19; CRYSTAL D SMITH (DEFENDANT);

04/20/2021: DECLARATION UNDER PENALTY OF PERJURY FORTHE CENTERES FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION'S TEMPORARY HALT IN EVICTIONS TO PREVENT FURTHER SPREAD OF COVID-19; CRYSTAL D SMITH (DEFENDANT);

ANSWER FILED BY SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT (SRL); CRYSTAL D SMITH (DEFENDANT);

04/20/2021: ANSWER FILED BY SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT (SRL); CRYSTAL D SMITH (DEFENDANT);

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AS TO CRYSTAL D SMITH (SUMMONS/COMPLAINT)

04/15/2021: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AS TO CRYSTAL D SMITH (SUMMONS/COMPLAINT)

COVER LETTER

04/15/2021: COVER LETTER

5/20 SUMMONS ISSUED TO CRYSTAL D SMITH; Receipt: 468439 Date: 04/12/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

04/09/2021: 5/20 SUMMONS ISSUED TO CRYSTAL D SMITH; Receipt: 468439 Date: 04/12/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

04/09/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

EVICTION COMPLAINT; Receipt: 468439 Date: 04/12/2021; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

04/09/2021: EVICTION COMPLAINT; Receipt: 468439 Date: 04/12/2021; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION REQUESTING MORE TIME IN THE FORM OF A LETTER FILED BY SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT (SRL); CRYSTAL D SMITH (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS ; POSTED 4/19/2021 AS TO CRYSTAL D SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DETERMINE RENT (SRL); CRYSTAL D SMITH (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION UNDER PENALTY OF PERJURY FORTHE CENTERES FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION'S TEMPORARY HALT IN EVICTIONS TO PREVENT FURTHER SPREAD OF COVID-19; CRYSTAL D SMITH (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER FILED BY SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT (SRL); CRYSTAL D SMITH (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AS TO CRYSTAL D SMITH (SUMMONS/COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $195.00; Total Fee Paid: $195.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 468439; Paid: $195.00; Applied: $195.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket5/20 SUMMONS ISSUED TO CRYSTAL D SMITH; Receipt: 468439 Date: 04/12/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVICTION COMPLAINT; Receipt: 468439 Date: 04/12/2021; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PEP-UF LLC is a litigant