Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 05/10/2021 at 16:08:14 (UTC).

PEP UF LLC -vs- JONES, KADEDRA L

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 PEP UF LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against JONES, KADEDRA L. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1261

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEP UF LLC

Defendant

JONES, KADEDRA L

Gainesville, FL 32607

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THRASHER III ESQ, ELWIN R

908 N Gadsden St

Tallahassee, FL 32303

 

Court Documents

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS SERVED ; 4/15/2021 AS TO KADEDRA L JONES

04/15/2021: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS SERVED ; 4/15/2021 AS TO KADEDRA L JONES

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; (SUMMONS & COMPLAINT)

04/14/2021: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; (SUMMONS & COMPLAINT)

COVER LETTER

04/14/2021: COVER LETTER

COVER LETTER

04/14/2021: COVER LETTER

SUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE; KADEDRA L JONES (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 468458 Date: 04/12/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

04/12/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE; KADEDRA L JONES (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 468458 Date: 04/12/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

04/09/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION - DELINQUENT TENANT Receipt: 468458 Date: 04/12/2021; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

04/09/2021: COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION - DELINQUENT TENANT Receipt: 468458 Date: 04/12/2021; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS SERVED ; 4/15/2021 AS TO KADEDRA L JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; (SUMMONS & COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $195.00; Total Fee Paid: $195.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 468458; Paid: $195.00; Applied: $195.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE; KADEDRA L JONES (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 468458 Date: 04/12/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION - DELINQUENT TENANT Receipt: 468458 Date: 04/12/2021; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PEP-UF LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELWIN R THRASHER