This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 08/24/2021 at 03:34:37 (UTC).

PEP-UF, LLC -vs- HERROD, CHRISTIAN A

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 PEP-UF, LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against HERROD, CHRISTIAN A. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1234

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEP-UF, LLC

Defendant

HERROD, CHRISTIAN A

Gainesville, FL 32607

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THRASHER III ESQ, ELWIN R.

908 N Gadsden St

Tallahassee, FL 32303

 

Court Documents

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF EVICTION (CLOSES)

08/01/2021: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF EVICTION (CLOSES)

ANSWER FILED BY SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT (SRL); CHRISTIAN A HERROD (DEFENDANT);

04/22/2021: ANSWER FILED BY SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT (SRL); CHRISTIAN A HERROD (DEFENDANT);

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS SERVED ; 4/15/2021 AS TO CHRISTIAN A HERROD

04/15/2021: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS SERVED ; 4/15/2021 AS TO CHRISTIAN A HERROD

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AS TO CHRISTIAN A HERROD (SUMMONS/COMPLAINT)

04/15/2021: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AS TO CHRISTIAN A HERROD (SUMMONS/COMPLAINT)

COVER LETTER

04/15/2021: COVER LETTER

SUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE Receipt: 468431 Date: 04/09/2021; CHRISTIAN A HERROD (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

04/08/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE Receipt: 468431 Date: 04/09/2021; CHRISTIAN A HERROD (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION - DELINQUENT TENANT Receipt: 468431 Date: 04/09/2021; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

04/08/2021: COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION - DELINQUENT TENANT Receipt: 468431 Date: 04/09/2021; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

04/08/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DispositionEVICTION RESIDENTIAL POSSESSION ONLY OR WITH DAMAGES UP TO $2500.00; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 04/08/2021; Disposition: BH01- BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF EVICTION (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER FILED BY SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT (SRL); CHRISTIAN A HERROD (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS SERVED ; 4/15/2021 AS TO CHRISTIAN A HERROD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AS TO CHRISTIAN A HERROD (SUMMONS/COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 468431; Paid: $195.00; Applied: $195.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $195.00; Total Fee Paid: $195.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE Receipt: 468431 Date: 04/09/2021; CHRISTIAN A HERROD (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION - DELINQUENT TENANT Receipt: 468431 Date: 04/09/2021; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PEP-UF LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELWIN R THRASHER