This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 10/02/2022 at 08:09:20 (UTC).

PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC - VS - WEISMAN, KYLE ROBERT et al

Case Summary

On 08/02/2022 PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC - filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against - WEISMAN, KYLE ROBERT. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2324

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC

Defendants

WEISMAN, KYLE ROBERT

Fort Myers, FL 33967

LORDUY, ALICIA

Vancouver, WA 98686

WEISMAN, ALICIA

WEISMAN, KAYLA

Plantation, FL 33325

WILLIAMS, JOSHUA

Cross City, FL 32628

MARTIN, KARVELA A

Gainesville, FL 32608

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

CLERK OF THE COURT OF ALACHUA COUNTY FLORIDA THE

201 E University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY IN

111 N Adams Street 4Th Floor

Tallahassee, FL 32301

UNIVERSITY OF FLORIDA

C/O General Counsel, 4202 E Fowler Ave Cgs 301

Tampa, FL 33620

WILLIAMS, MARY M

Middleburg, FL 32068

WEISMAN KYLE ROBERT AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF

Fort Myers, FL 33967

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

ANY AND ALL UNKNOW PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ALICIA LORDUY

Vancouver, WA 98686

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ALICIA WEISMAN

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOSHUA WILLIAMS

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KAYLA WEISMAN

Plantation, FL 33325

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLINS ESQ, SARA

225 E Robinson St Ste 155

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant Attorneys

RICCIARDI JR, RICHARD M

12381 S Cleveland Ave, Suite 200

Ft Myers, FL 33907

SPERBECK, JEAN A.

201 E University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

MAIL RETURNED; JOSHUA WILLIAMS (DEFENDANT);

09/27/2022: MAIL RETURNED; JOSHUA WILLIAMS (DEFENDANT);

ALIAS 20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO ; UNIVERSITY OF FLORIDA; Receipt: 491161 Date: 09/26/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

09/22/2022: ALIAS 20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO ; UNIVERSITY OF FLORIDA; Receipt: 491161 Date: 09/26/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

SHERIFF'S RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON SUMMONS ON 8/29/2022; CLERK OF THE COURT OF ALACHUA COUNTY FLORIDA THE (DEFENDANT);

09/20/2022: SHERIFF'S RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON SUMMONS ON 8/29/2022; CLERK OF THE COURT OF ALACHUA COUNTY FLORIDA THE (DEFENDANT);

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED ON SUMMONS ON 8/11/2022; UNIVERSITY OF FLORIDA (DEFENDANT);

09/20/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED ON SUMMONS ON 8/11/2022; UNIVERSITY OF FLORIDA (DEFENDANT);

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON SUMMONS ON 8/22/2022; JOSHUA WILLIAMS (DEFENDANT);

09/20/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON SUMMONS ON 8/22/2022; JOSHUA WILLIAMS (DEFENDANT);

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE SERVED ON SUMMONS ON 8/8/2022; KAYLA WEISMAN (DEFENDANT);

09/20/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE SERVED ON SUMMONS ON 8/8/2022; KAYLA WEISMAN (DEFENDANT);

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED ON SUMMONS ON 8/20/2022; WEISMAN KYLE ROBERT AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF (DEFENDANT);

09/20/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED ON SUMMONS ON 8/20/2022; WEISMAN KYLE ROBERT AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF (DEFENDANT);

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED ON SUMMONS ON 8/20/2022; UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KYLE ROBERT WEISMAN (DEFENDANT);

09/20/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED ON SUMMONS ON 8/20/2022; UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KYLE ROBERT WEISMAN (DEFENDANT);

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED ON SUMMONS ON 8/20/2022; KYLE ROBERT WEISMAN (DEFENDANT);

09/20/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED ON SUMMONS ON 8/20/2022; KYLE ROBERT WEISMAN (DEFENDANT);

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON SUMMONS ON 8/9/2022; UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY IN (DEFENDANT);

09/20/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON SUMMONS ON 8/9/2022; UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY IN (DEFENDANT);

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON SUMMONS ON 8/11/2022; STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE (DEFENDANT);

09/19/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON SUMMONS ON 8/11/2022; STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE (DEFENDANT);

ORDER TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS

09/16/2022: ORDER TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON SUMMONS - UNSERVED 9/14/2022; MARY M WILLIAMS (DEFENDANT);

09/16/2022: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON SUMMONS - UNSERVED 9/14/2022; MARY M WILLIAMS (DEFENDANT);

AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO EXTENSION OF TIME

09/15/2022: AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO EXTENSION OF TIME

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 490761 Date: 09/15/2022; KARVELA A MARTIN (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

09/14/2022: ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 490761 Date: 09/15/2022; KARVELA A MARTIN (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

RESPONSE FILED BY (SRL); JOSHUA WILLIAMS (DEFENDANT);

09/12/2022: RESPONSE FILED BY (SRL); JOSHUA WILLIAMS (DEFENDANT);

MAIL RETURNED; KARVELA A MARTIN (DEFENDANT);

09/02/2022: MAIL RETURNED; KARVELA A MARTIN (DEFENDANT);

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED; JOSHUA WILLIAMS (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • FinancialReceipt #: 491161; Paid: 491161; Applied: $10.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALIAS 20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO ; UNIVERSITY OF FLORIDA; Receipt: 491161 Date: 09/26/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON SUMMONS ON 8/29/2022; CLERK OF THE COURT OF ALACHUA COUNTY FLORIDA THE (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED ON SUMMONS ON 8/11/2022; UNIVERSITY OF FLORIDA (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON SUMMONS ON 8/22/2022; JOSHUA WILLIAMS (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE SERVED ON SUMMONS ON 8/8/2022; KAYLA WEISMAN (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED ON SUMMONS ON 8/20/2022; WEISMAN KYLE ROBERT AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED ON SUMMONS ON 8/20/2022; UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KYLE ROBERT WEISMAN (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED ON SUMMONS ON 8/20/2022; KYLE ROBERT WEISMAN (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketRECORDING FEE - FIRST PAGE OF LIS PENDENS Receipt: 488850 Date: 08/04/2022; Amount: $5.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketJUDICIAL SALE FEE Receipt: 488850 Date: 08/04/2022; Amount: $70.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE (>$50,000.01 < $250.000.) (E-REDACTED) Receipt: 488850 Date: 08/04/2022; Amount: $905.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSITY OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE is a litigant

Latest cases where Unite States of America Dept of Treasury is a litigant

Latest cases where Clerk of the Court of Brwd Cty is a litigant