Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 02/11/2020 at 18:05:57 (UTC).

PATEL, NIEL -VS- VEAL, ASHLEY et al

Case Summary

On 06/29/2018 PATEL, NIEL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against VEAL, ASHLEY. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2119

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PATEL, NIEL

Defendants

VEAL, ASHLEY

Gainesville, FL 32609

RESCARE INC

C/O The Prentice-Hall Corporation System Inc, 1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GAMBLER II ESQ., NEAL J

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Attorney At Law, 1511 Nw 6 Street

Gainesville, FL 32601

Defendant Attorney

COOK, KIMBERLY A

777 Brickell Avenue Suite 1370

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL

01/13/2020: FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

10/18/2019: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

DEFENDANTS WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST

09/25/2019: DEFENDANTS WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST

DEFENDANTS EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE

09/25/2019: DEFENDANTS EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE

PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S SECOND REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/16/2019: PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S SECOND REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR COPIES

08/21/2019: REQUEST FOR COPIES

JOINT STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

07/01/2019: JOINT STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION REGARDING DEFENDANTS, ASHLEY VEAL AND RESCARE, INC. NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES DATED MARCH 8, 2019

03/29/2019: CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION REGARDING DEFENDANTS, ASHLEY VEAL AND RESCARE, INC. NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES DATED MARCH 8, 2019

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING VERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES

02/07/2019: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING VERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES

HEARING DISPOSITION FORM

02/01/2019: HEARING DISPOSITION FORM

FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE DIRECTED TO PLAINTIFF OF DEFENDANTS ASHLEY VEAL AND RESCARE INC

11/29/2018: FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE DIRECTED TO PLAINTIFF OF DEFENDANTS ASHLEY VEAL AND RESCARE INC

RESPONSE OF DEFENDANT ASHLEY VEAL TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/29/2018: RESPONSE OF DEFENDANT ASHLEY VEAL TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SERVED; ASHLEY VEAL (DEFENDANT);

09/28/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SERVED; ASHLEY VEAL (DEFENDANT);

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SERVED; RESCARE INC (DEFENDANT);

09/28/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SERVED; RESCARE INC (DEFENDANT);

ALIAS SUMMONS - ISSUED; RESCARE INC (DEFENDANT);

09/28/2018: ALIAS SUMMONS - ISSUED; RESCARE INC (DEFENDANT);

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

07/17/2018: ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT ASHLEY VEAL

06/29/2018: NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT ASHLEY VEAL

COMPLAINT Receipt: 421702 Date: 06/29/2018; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

06/29/2018: COMPLAINT Receipt: 421702 Date: 06/29/2018; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • DispositionAUTO NEGLIGENCE; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 06/29/2018; Disposition: DJ01 - JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY PURSUANT TO RULE 1.720

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (AS TO TIME)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANTS WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANTS EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 421702 Date: 06/29/2018; ASHLEY VEAL (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 421702 Date: 06/29/2018; RESCARE INC (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT RESCARE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT ASHLEY VEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION TO DEFENDANT ASHLEY VEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION TO DEFENDANT RESCARE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT RESCARE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT ASHLEY VEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - DOES NOT STATE IF JURY TRIAL IS REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Receipt: 421702 Date: 06/29/2018; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RESCARE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cook, Kimberly A