This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 01/11/2023 at 09:23:46 (UTC).

PARTRIDGE, MICHAEL B -vs- HARRIS, RYAN

Case Summary

On 11/10/2022 PARTRIDGE, MICHAEL B filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against HARRIS, RYAN. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4198

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARTRIDGE, MICHAEL B

Gainesville, FL 32601

Defendant

HARRIS, RYAN

Gainesville, FL 32653

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION - NO MONEY CLAIM Receipt: 493225 Date: 11/10/2022; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

11/10/2022: COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION - NO MONEY CLAIM Receipt: 493225 Date: 11/10/2022; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

11/10/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

SUMMONS ISSUED; RYAN HARRIS (DEFENDANT);

11/10/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED; RYAN HARRIS (DEFENDANT);

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; RYAN HARRIS (DEFENDANT);

11/10/2022: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; RYAN HARRIS (DEFENDANT);

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON EVICTION SUMMONS - POSTED 11/18/2022; RYAN HARRIS (DEFENDANT);

11/23/2022: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON EVICTION SUMMONS - POSTED 11/18/2022; RYAN HARRIS (DEFENDANT);

MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

12/05/2022: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - RESIDENTIAL EVICTION AND DEFAULT ISSUED BY CLERK 12/5/22 KCA

12/05/2022: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - RESIDENTIAL EVICTION AND DEFAULT ISSUED BY CLERK 12/5/22 KCA

ORDER SETTING REMOTE HEARING; THURSDAY, JANUARY 19, 2023 AT 3:00 P.M.

01/06/2023: ORDER SETTING REMOTE HEARING; THURSDAY, JANUARY 19, 2023 AT 3:00 P.M.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING REMOTE HEARING; THURSDAY, JANUARY 19, 2023 AT 3:00 P.M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - RESIDENTIAL EVICTION AND DEFAULT ISSUED BY CLERK 12/5/22 KCA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON EVICTION SUMMONS - POSTED 11/18/2022; RYAN HARRIS (DEFENDANT);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $195.00; Total Fee Paid: $195.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • FinancialReceipt #: 493225; Paid: 493225; Applied: $195.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; RYAN HARRIS (DEFENDANT);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; RYAN HARRIS (DEFENDANT);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS FEE (34.041(1)(d) COUNTY CIVIL) Receipt: 493225 Date: 11/10/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION - NO MONEY CLAIM Receipt: 493225 Date: 11/10/2022; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less